This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 03/10/2021 at 17:36:51 (UTC).

DOUGLAS, TONYA vs. FAMILY DOLLAR STORES OF TEXAS LLC

Case Summary

On 11/05/2020 DOUGLAS, TONYA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FAMILY DOLLAR STORES OF TEXAS LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DEDRA DAVIS. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1257

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DEDRA DAVIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOUGLAS, TONYA

Defendant

FAMILY DOLLAR STORES OF TEXAS LLC

Other

FAMILY DOLLAR STORES OF TEXAS LLC MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS BY

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SANES, SCOTT ADAM

11200 W. Broadwa

Pearland, TX 77584

Defendant Attorney

RILEY, KEVIN P.

4400 Post Oak P

Houston, TX 77027

 

Court Documents

Exhibit A

12/03/2020: Exhibit A

Defendant Family Dollar Stores of Texas, Llc's Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

12/03/2020: Defendant Family Dollar Stores of Texas, Llc's Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

DEFENDANT FAMILY DOLLAR STORES OF TEXAS LLCS JURY DEMAND

12/03/2020: DEFENDANT FAMILY DOLLAR STORES OF TEXAS LLCS JURY DEMAND

Defendant Family Dollar Stores of Texas, LLC's Original Answer

12/03/2020: Defendant Family Dollar Stores of Texas, LLC's Original Answer

DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

12/08/2020: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

Citation - Family Dollar

11/16/2020: Citation - Family Dollar

Request for Issuance of Service

11/05/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

11/05/2020: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • HearingCourt: 270; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: Trial on Merits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • HearingCourt: 270; Docket Type: Trial Coordinators Docket; Reason: DOCKET CALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 12/8/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RILEY, KEVIN P.; Person Filing: FAMILY DOLLAR STORES OF TEXAS LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: FAMILY DOLLAR STORES OF TEXAS LLC MAY BE SERVED WITH PROCESS BY; Issued: 11/5/2020; Served: 11/10/2020; Tracking: 73808612; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SANES, SCOTT ADAM; Person Filing: DOUGLAS, TONYA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Family Dollar Stores of Texas, LLC d/b/a Family Dollar a/k/a Family Dollar-Katy is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANES, SCOTT ADAM