This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:08:32 (UTC).

DONHAM, CAROL A vs. DONHAM, BILL N JR

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 DONHAM, CAROL A filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DONHAM, BILL N JR. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8068

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DONHAM, CAROL A

Defendant

DONHAM, BILL N JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2005
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF WAIVER ORDER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED CHANGING NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2005
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2005
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2005
  • WAIVER CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2004
  • WAIVER CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less