This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 07:16:21 (UTC).

DOGGETT HEAVY MACHINERY SERVICES LLC vs. P2 LAND SERVICES LLC

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 DOGGETT HEAVY MACHINERY SERVICES LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against P2 LAND SERVICES LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CORY SEPOLIO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1322

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CORY SEPOLIO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOGGETT HEAVY MACHINERY SERVICES LLC

Defendants

KERR, MARK ANTHONY (JR)

Kyle, TX 78640

P2 LAND SERVICES LLC

Other

P2 LAND SERVICES LLC (A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION) BY SERVING ITS

109 Johnny Hall Road

Kyle, TX 78640

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KUNTZ, JOHN DAVID

 

Court Documents

Certified Mail Receipt

05/28/2020: Certified Mail Receipt

Certified Mail Receipt

05/28/2020: Certified Mail Receipt

Request for Service

06/12/2020: Request for Service

Return Mail Undeliverable

06/15/2020: Return Mail Undeliverable

Request for Issuance of Service

05/26/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Exhibit C

05/26/2020: Exhibit C

Exhibit B (1)

05/26/2020: Exhibit B (1)

Exhibit A (1)

05/26/2020: Exhibit A (1)

Plaintiff's original petition & request for disclosure

05/26/2020: Plaintiff's original petition & request for disclosure

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7019 2280 0000 0781 7521

05/27/2020: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7019 2280 0000 0781 7521

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7019 2280 0000 0781 7514

05/27/2020: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7019 2280 0000 0781 7514

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: P2 LAND SERVICES LLC (A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION) BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 6/15/2020; Tracking: 73758082; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: KERR, MARK ANTHONY (JR); Issued: 6/15/2020; Tracking: 73758080; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: KERR, MARK ANTHONY (JR); Issued: 5/27/2020; Tracking: 73753060; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: P2 LAND SERVICES LLC (A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION) BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 5/27/2020; Tracking: 73753058; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: KUNTZ, JOHN DAVID; Person Filing: DOGGETT HEAVY MACHINERY SERVICES LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less