This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 07:16:10 (UTC).

DOGGETT HEAVY MACHINERY SERVICES LLC vs. GLOBAL FIBERGLASS SOLUTIONS OF TEXAS LLC

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 DOGGETT HEAVY MACHINERY SERVICES LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GLOBAL FIBERGLASS SOLUTIONS OF TEXAS LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is R. K. SANDILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1320

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

R. K. SANDILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOGGETT HEAVY MACHINERY SERVICES LLC

Defendants

GLOBAL FIBERGLASS SOLUTIONS OF TEXAS LLC

GFSI-MHE MANUFACTURING OF TEXAS LLC

Others

GFSI-MHE MANUFACTURING OF TEXAS LLC (A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION)

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

GLOBAL FIBERGLASS SOLUTIONS OF TEXAS LLC (A LIMITED LIABILITY

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KUNTZ, JOHN DAVID

 

Court Documents

Certified Mail Receipt

05/28/2020: Certified Mail Receipt

Certified Mail Receipt

05/28/2020: Certified Mail Receipt

Domestic Return Receipt

06/09/2020: Domestic Return Receipt

Domestic Return Receipt

06/09/2020: Domestic Return Receipt

Request for Issuance of Service

05/26/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Exhibit B

05/26/2020: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

05/26/2020: Exhibit A

Plaintiff's original petition & request for disclosure

05/26/2020: Plaintiff's original petition & request for disclosure

Request for Issuance of Service

05/27/2020: Request for Issuance of Service

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7019 2280 0000 0781 3257

05/27/2020: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7019 2280 0000 0781 3257

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7019 2280 0000 0781 3240

05/27/2020: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7019 2280 0000 0781 3240

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GFSI-MHE MANUFACTURING OF TEXAS LLC (A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION); Issued: 5/27/2020; Tracking: 73753044; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GLOBAL FIBERGLASS SOLUTIONS OF TEXAS LLC (A LIMITED LIABILITY; Issued: 5/27/2020; Tracking: 73753043; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: KUNTZ, JOHN DAVID; Person Filing: DOGGETT HEAVY MACHINERY SERVICES LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less