This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 03/23/2022 at 05:51:54 (UTC).

DOE, JANE (K B) vs. BACKPAGE.COM LLC

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 DOE, JANE K B filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BACKPAGE COM LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LAUREN REEDER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2660

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LAUREN REEDER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOE, JANE (K B)

Defendants

BACKPAGE.COM LLC

FACEBOOK, INC. N/K/A META PLATFORMS, INC.

META PLATFORMS, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MCADAMS, ANN-THERESE

MCADAMS, ANNIE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

01/18/2022: Notice of Hearing

Plaintiffs Original Petition

01/14/2022: Plaintiffs Original Petition

Plaintiff's First Amended Petition and Application for Abatement of a Public Nuisance

01/14/2022: Plaintiff's First Amended Petition and Application for Abatement of a Public Nuisance

Motion for Preservation of Evidence, Request for Emergency Hearing and Notice of Submission of Documents to the Court

01/14/2022: Motion for Preservation of Evidence, Request for Emergency Hearing and Notice of Submission of Documents to the Court

Proposed Order

01/14/2022: Proposed Order

Defendant Facebook, Inc N/K/A Meta Platforms, Inc's Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

01/21/2022: Defendant Facebook, Inc N/K/A Meta Platforms, Inc's Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

Exhibit A

01/21/2022: Exhibit A

REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT

01/21/2022: REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2022
  • HearingCourt: 234; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: SAFEKEEPING OF EVIDENCE (MOTION FOR); Results: Passed; Comments: PER ANN 01/20/2022 11:52; Requesting Party: MCADAMS, ANNIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCADAMS, ANNIE; Person Filing: DOE, JANE (K B);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCADAMS, ANNIE; Person Filing: DOE, JANE (K B);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where backpage.com, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Facebook is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCADAMS, ANNIE