This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 03/23/2022 at 05:58:18 (UTC).

DIXON, DOUGLAS vs. ASHLAND LLC (INDIVIDUALLY AND FORMERLY KNOWN AS ASHLAND INC

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 DIXON, DOUGLAS filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against ASHLAND LLC INDIVIDUALLY AND FORMERLY KNOWN AS ASHLAND INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BRITTANYE MORRIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2720

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BRITTANYE MORRIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIXON, DOUGLAS

Defendants and Others

ASHLAND LLC (INDIVIDUALLY AND FORMERLY KNOWN AS ASHLAND INC

1999 Bryan St Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

BERRYMAN PRODUCTS INC

BRENNTAG SOUTHWEST INC (INDIVIDUALLY AND FKA BRENNTAG INC DELTA

1999 Bryan St Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

CHEVRON U S A INC (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS THE SUCCESSOR TO GULF OIL

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

RADIATOR SPECIALTY COMPANY

SHELL OIL COMPANY (INDIVIDUALLY AND A SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO SHELL

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

TEXACO INC

UNION OIL COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION (INDIVIDUALLY FKA UNITED STATES STEEL

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

W M BARR & CO INC

ASHLAND INC

ASHLAND OIL & REFINING COMPANY

ASHLAND OIL INC

BRENNTAG INC

DELTA DISTRIBUTORS INC

DELTA SOLVENTS & CHEMICALS CO

SOCO CHEMICAL INC

UNITED STATES STEEK LLC

USX CORPORATION

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLACK, JAMES ROBERT

Defendant Attorneys

SCOTT, ROBERT PHILIP

FOWLER, LARRY LEE JR.

BAKER, MICHAEL L.

WEINER, MONIQUE M

PUJOL, PATRICE

Other Attorneys

MERKLEY, DAVID LAWRENCE

 

Court Documents

Certified Mail Receipt

01/19/2022: Certified Mail Receipt

Certified Mail Receipt

01/19/2022: Certified Mail Receipt

Certified Mail Receipt

01/19/2022: Certified Mail Receipt

Certified Mail Receipt

01/19/2022: Certified Mail Receipt

Certified Mail Receipt

01/19/2022: Certified Mail Receipt

Certified Mail Receipt

01/19/2022: Certified Mail Receipt

Certified Mail Receipt

01/19/2022: Certified Mail Receipt

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7018 2290 0001 3524 9612

01/19/2022: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7018 2290 0001 3524 9612

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7018 2290 0001 3524 9629

01/19/2022: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7018 2290 0001 3524 9629

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7018 2290 0001 3524 9636

01/19/2022: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7018 2290 0001 3524 9636

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7018 2290 0001 3524 9643

01/19/2022: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7018 2290 0001 3524 9643

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7018 2290 0001 3524 9650

01/19/2022: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7018 2290 0001 3524 9650

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7018 2290 0001 3524 9667

01/19/2022: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7018 2290 0001 3524 9667

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7018 2290 0001 3524 9674

01/19/2022: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7018 2290 0001 3524 9674

Certified Mail Tracking Number 7018 2290 0001 3524 9681

01/19/2022: Certified Mail Tracking Number 7018 2290 0001 3524 9681

Domestic Return Receipt

02/02/2022: Domestic Return Receipt

Domestic Return Receipt

02/02/2022: Domestic Return Receipt

Domestic Return Receipt

02/02/2022: Domestic Return Receipt

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PUJOL, PATRICE; Person Filing: UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION (INDIVIDUALLY FKA UNITED STATES STEEL;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SCOTT, ROBERT PHILIP; Person Filing: ASHLAND LLC (INDIVIDUALLY AND FORMERLY KNOWN AS ASHLAND INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MERKLEY, DAVID LAWRENCE; Person Filing: BRENNTAG SOUTHWEST INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FOWLER, LARRY LEE JR.; Person Filing: BERRYMAN PRODUCTS INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BAKER, MICHAEL L.; Person Filing: UNION OIL COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BAKER, MICHAEL L.; Person Filing: CHEVRON U S A INC (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS THE SUCCESSOR TO GULF OIL;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WEINER, MONIQUE M; Person Filing: SHELL OIL COMPANY (INDIVIDUALLY AND A SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO SHELL;

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: UNION OIL COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN; Issued: 1/19/2022; Served: 1/24/2022; Tracking: 73961421; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXACO INC (DELAWARE CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS; Issued: 1/19/2022; Served: 1/24/2022; Tracking: 73961419; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SHELL OIL COMPANY (INDIVIDUALLY AND A SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO SHELL; Issued: 1/19/2022; Served: 1/21/2022; Tracking: 73961418; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE CORPORATE NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: RADIATOR SPECIALTY COMPANY (NORTH CAROLINA CORPORATION) MAY BE; Issued: 1/19/2022; Tracking: 73961417; Deliver To: MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CHEVRON U S A INC (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS THE SUCCESSOR TO GULF OIL; Issued: 1/19/2022; Served: 1/24/2022; Tracking: 73961415; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BRENNTAG SOUTHWEST INC (INDIVIDUALLY AND FKA BRENNTAG INC DELTA; Issued: 1/19/2022; Served: 1/21/2022; Tracking: 73961414; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BERRYMAN PRODUCTS INC (TEXAS CORPORATION); Issued: 1/19/2022; Served: 1/24/2022; Tracking: 73961412; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (CERTIFIED); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ASHLAND LLC (INDIVIDUALLY AND FORMERLY KNOWN AS ASHLAND INC; Issued: 1/19/2022; Served: 1/21/2022; Tracking: 73961408; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BLACK, JAMES ROBERT; Person Filing: DIXON, DOUGLAS;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BERRYMAN PRODUCTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION (INDIVIDUALLY F/K/A UNITED STATES is a litigant

Latest cases where USX CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BRENNTAG SOUTHEAST INC. is a litigant