This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:21:11 (UTC).

DIXIE CARPET INSTALLATIONS INC vs. TRIMARK REALTY DEVELOPMENT L C

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 DIXIE CARPET INSTALLATIONS INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TRIMARK REALTY DEVELOPMENT L C. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8558

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIXIE CARPET INSTALLATIONS INC

Defendants

TRIMARK REALTY DEVELOPMENT L C

OCTAGON 2000 LLC

RRGI QUAIL CREEK LLC

QUAIL CREEK LLC

RRGI RAVENWOOD

RAVENWOOD APARTMENTS LLC

RRGI SPRINGTOWNE LLC

RUSHCREEK APARTMENTS LLC

RRGI FAWNDALE LLC

FAWNDALE APARTMENTS LLC

RRGI RAVENWOOD LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RALEY, JOHN KEVIN

Defendant Attorney

WALLACE, DANA KIMBERLI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2006
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, FINAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2005
  • ANSWER : Filing Attorney - WALLACE, DANA KIMBERLI Person Filing - RRGI RAVENWOOD LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2005
  • ANSWER : Filing Attorney - WALLACE, DANA KIMBERLI Person Filing - RAVENWOOD APARTMENTS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2005
  • ANSWER : Filing Attorney - WALLACE, DANA KIMBERLI Person Filing - RRGI FAWNDALE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2005
  • ANSWER : Filing Attorney - WALLACE, DANA KIMBERLI Person Filing - FAWNDALE APARTMENTS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WALLACE, DANA KIMBERLI Person Filing - RRGI RAVENWOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WALLACE, DANA KIMBERLI Person Filing - RRGI QUAIL CREEK LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WALLACE, DANA KIMBERLI Person Filing - QUAIL CREEK LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WALLACE, DANA KIMBERLI Person Filing - OCTAGON 2000 LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2005
  • ANSWER : Filing Attorney - WALLACE, DANA KIMBERLI Person Filing - RRGI SPRINGTOWNE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2005
  • ANSWER : Filing Attorney - WALLACE, DANA KIMBERLI Person Filing - RUSHCREEK APARTMENTS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WALLACE, DANA KIMBERLI Person Filing - TRIMARK REALTY DEVELOPMENT L C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2005
  • AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - RALEY, JOHN KEVIN Person Filing - DIXIE CARPET INSTALLATIONS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - RALEY, JOHN KEVIN Person Filing - DIXIE CARPET INSTALLATIONS INC

    Read MoreRead Less