This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 05/13/2019 at 11:43:57 (UTC).

DISHONGH, JAMES M (D/B/A M&J INVESTMENTS) vs. PRIORITY INVESTOR LOANS LLC

Case Summary

On 11/30/2018 DISHONGH, JAMES M D/B/A M J INVESTMENTS filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PRIORITY INVESTOR LOANS LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JACLENEL McFARLAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5345

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JACLENEL McFARLAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DISHONGH, JAMES M (D/B/A M&J INVESTMENTS)

M&J INVESTMENTS

Defendant

PRIORITY INVESTOR LOANS LLC

Other

PRIORITY INVESTOR LOANS LLC MAY BE SERVED THROUGH GEOFF GIERING

Houston, TX 77027

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VILT, ROBERT C.

5177 Richmond A

Houston, TX 77056

 

Court Documents

Citation

12/11/2018: Citation

Temporary Restraining Order

12/11/2018: Temporary Restraining Order

Proposed Order Granting Notice of Non-suit

02/04/2019: Proposed Order Granting Notice of Non-suit

Notice of Non-suit

02/04/2019: Notice of Non-suit

DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

02/12/2019: DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

Proposed Order Granting Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order

12/06/2018: Proposed Order Granting Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order

Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order

12/06/2018: Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order

ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER SIGNED

12/10/2018: ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER SIGNED

ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED

11/30/2018: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED

Civil Process Request Form

11/30/2018: Civil Process Request Form

Civil Case Information Sheet

11/30/2018: Civil Case Information Sheet

Temporary Restraining Order

11/30/2018: Temporary Restraining Order

Exhibit 04

11/30/2018: Exhibit 04

Exhibit 03

11/30/2018: Exhibit 03

Exhibit 02

11/30/2018: Exhibit 02

Exhibit 01

11/30/2018: Exhibit 01

Verifed Original Petition and Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction and Permanent Injunction

11/30/2018: Verifed Original Petition and Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction and Permanent Injunction

Civil Process Pick-Up Form

12/03/2018: Civil Process Pick-Up Form

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2019
  • Description: PLAINTIFF COSTS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • Description: DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION; Order Signed: 2/12/2019;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Description: ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER SIGNED; Order Signed: 12/10/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Description: APPEARANCE ON TEMPORARY INJ OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 11/30/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Description: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED; Order Signed: 11/30/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Order Signed: 11/30/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: VILT, ROBERT C.; Person Filing: DISHONGH, JAMES M (D/B/A M&J INVESTMENTS);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: VILT, ROBERT C.; Person Filing: M&J INVESTMENTS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Description: MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER GRANTED;

    Read MoreRead Less