This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 08/08/2021 at 07:17:52 (UTC).

DIAZ, RUBEN vs. MCKINLEY, ANTHONY ANDERSON

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 DIAZ, RUBEN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MCKINLEY, ANTHONY ANDERSON. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2649

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIAZ, RUBEN

Defendants

MCKINLEY, ANTHONY ANDERSON

Houston, TX 77070

SONNY'S ENTERPRISES LLC

Other

SONNY'S ENTERPRISES LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THURLOW, THOMAS N.

 

Court Documents

Request for Issuance of Service

07/15/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

07/15/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Plaintiff's Original Petition

07/15/2021: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Citation Return.

07/16/2021: Citation Return.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MCKINLEY, ANTHONY ANDERSON; Issued: 7/15/2021; Tracking: 73891043; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SONNY'S ENTERPRISES LLC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED; Issued: 7/15/2021; Served: 7/16/2021; Tracking: 73891040; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: THURLOW, THOMAS N.; Person Filing: DIAZ, RUBEN;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer THURLOW, THOMAS N.