This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/22/2021 at 07:17:40 (UTC).

DIAZ, CYNTHIA SUSANA vs. KROGER TEXAS LP

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 DIAZ, CYNTHIA SUSANA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KROGER TEXAS LP. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERICKA PHILLIPS. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8573

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERICKA PHILLIPS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIAZ, CYNTHIA SUSANA

Defendant

KROGER TEXAS LP

Other

KROGER TEXAS LP (DOMESTIC FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE, CHUNG YUAN

Defendant Attorney

AKERS, BROCK C.

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANTS APPLICATION AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

07/09/2021: DEFENDANTS APPLICATION AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

Defendant's Original Answer

07/09/2021: Defendant's Original Answer

Affidavit Of Service- Kroger Texas LP

07/13/2021: Affidavit Of Service- Kroger Texas LP

Defendant's First Amended Original Answer

07/20/2021: Defendant's First Amended Original Answer

Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Request for Disclosure

07/20/2021: Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Request for Disclosure

DOCKET CONTROL ORDER

07/21/2021: DOCKET CONTROL ORDER

Plaintiff's Amended Original Petition Interrogatories And Request For Production

06/28/2021: Plaintiff's Amended Original Petition Interrogatories And Request For Production

Request for Issuance of Service

06/28/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Civil Case Information Sheet

06/28/2021: Civil Case Information Sheet

Plaintiff's Original Petition Interrogatories and Request for Production

06/28/2021: Plaintiff's Original Petition Interrogatories and Request for Production

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • HearingCourt: 061; Docket Type: Trial Setting; Reason: Trial on Merits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: DESIGNATED TRIAL READY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: AKERS, BROCK C.; Person Filing: KROGER TEXAS LP;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: AKERS, BROCK C.; Person Filing: KROGER TEXAS LP;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: KROGER TEXAS LP (DOMESTIC FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED; Issued: 6/28/2021; Served: 7/2/2021; Tracking: 73884568; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LEE, CHUNG YUAN; Person Filing: DIAZ, CYNTHIA SUSANA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LEE, CHUNG YUAN; Person Filing: DIAZ, CYNTHIA SUSANA;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kroger Texas LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AKERS, BROCK C.