This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 12/22/2018 at 07:32:11 (UTC).

DHI HOLDINGS LP vs. RW MORTGAGE SERVICES

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 DHI HOLDINGS LP filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against RW MORTGAGE SERVICES. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL LANDRUM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4800

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL LANDRUM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DHI HOLDINGS LP

9107 Huckinston Court

Spring, TX 77379

Defendants

OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC

OPTION ONE MORTGAGE CORPORATION

U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (AS TRUSTEE FOR STRUCTURED ASSET

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

AMERICAN HOME MORTGAGE SERVICING INC NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

211 Ease 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

RW MORTGAGE SERVICES

Others and Defendants

U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (AS TRUSTEE FOR STRUCTURED ASSET

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

AMERICAN HOME MORTGAGE SERVICING INC NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

211 Ease 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

OPTION ONE MORTGAGE CORPORATION (FOREIGN CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC(FOREIGN LLC) MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACKSON, JEFFREY CRAIG

2200 N. Loop We

Houston, TX 77018

 

Court Documents

Civil Process Request

12/04/2018: Civil Process Request

Civil Process Pick-Up Form

12/05/2018: Civil Process Pick-Up Form

Exhibit 1 (Notice of Removal)

12/06/2018: Exhibit 1 (Notice of Removal)

Notice to State Court of Removal of Action

12/06/2018: Notice to State Court of Removal of Action

Defendants' Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses

12/06/2018: Defendants' Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses

Exhibit 11

11/28/2018: Exhibit 11

Exhibit 10

11/28/2018: Exhibit 10

Exhibit 09

11/28/2018: Exhibit 09

Exhibit 08

11/28/2018: Exhibit 08

Exhibit 07

11/28/2018: Exhibit 07

Exhibit 06

11/28/2018: Exhibit 06

Exhibit 05

11/28/2018: Exhibit 05

Exhibit 03

11/28/2018: Exhibit 03

Exhibit 02

11/28/2018: Exhibit 02

Civil Case Information Sheet

11/28/2018: Civil Case Information Sheet

Plaintiff's Original Petition and Application for Ex-Parte Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction

11/28/2018: Plaintiff's Original Petition and Application for Ex-Parte Temporary Restraining Order and Temporary Injunction

ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED

11/29/2018: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED

Clerk's certificate of cash deposit in lieu of injunction bond per order of the court

11/30/2018: Clerk's certificate of cash deposit in lieu of injunction bond per order of the court

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2018
  • Description: REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 11/29/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Description: APPEARANCE ON TEMPORARY INJ OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Description: ORDER SETTING BOND SIGNED; Order Signed: 11/29/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Description: ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; Order Signed: 11/29/2018;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Description: MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER GRANTED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: JACKSON, JEFFREY CRAIG; Person Filing: DHI HOLDINGS LP;

    Read MoreRead Less