This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/30/2020 at 08:06:14 (UTC).

DENNIS, KIMBERLY vs. HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE

Case Summary

On 07/06/2020 DENNIS, KIMBERLY filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DARYL L. MOORE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9880

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DARYL L. MOORE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DENNIS, KIMBERLY

Defendants

TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT

HARRIS COUNTY OFFICE OF COURT SERVICES

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE

Others

HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT BY SERVING KRISTIE LEWIS

TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

1200 Baker Street

Houston, TX 77011

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

Prairie Ste 880

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES BY SERVING KELVIN L BANKS DIRECTOR

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT

Po Box 4143

Austin, TX 78765

HARRIS COUNTY OFFICE OF COURT SERVICES BY SERVING

102 San Jacinto

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING SCOTT A DURFEE

1310 Prairie 5Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUNN, BRENNEN PAUL

2646 South Loop

Houston, TX 77054

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • HearingCourt: 333; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION; Requesting Party: DUNN, BRENNEN PAUL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION CENTER BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 7/20/2020; Tracking: 73766714; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY OFFICE OF COURT SERVICES BY SERVING; Issued: 7/20/2020; Tracking: 73766711; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY SERVING EXPUNCTION UNIT; Issued: 7/20/2020; Tracking: 73766710; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT BY SERVING KRISTIE LEWIS; Issued: 7/20/2020; Tracking: 73766709; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT BY SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY; Issued: 7/20/2020; Tracking: 73766708; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE BY SERVING SCOTT A DURFEE; Issued: 7/20/2020; Tracking: 73766707; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketType of Service: NOTICE OF EXPUNCTION HEARING; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE BY SERVING RANDALL SMIDT; Issued: 7/20/2020; Tracking: 73766706; Deliver To: CVC/CTM SVCE BY CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: SENSITIVE DATA DOCUMENT; Order Signed: 7/15/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 7/15/2020;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DUNN, BRENNEN PAUL; Person Filing: DENNIS, KIMBERLY;

    Read MoreRead Less