This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 11:23:38 (UTC).

DEBERRY, CLYDE BENJAMIN vs. A W CHESTERTON CO

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 DEBERRY, CLYDE BENJAMIN filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON CO. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******741B

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEBERRY, CLYDE BENJAMIN

Defendants

A W CHESTERTON CO

AMERICAN STANDARD INC

AQUA-CHEM INC (D/B/A CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION)

CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION

BABCOCK BORSIG POWER INC (F/K/A D B RILEY INC (F/K/A RILEY STOKER

D B RILEY INC

RILEY STOKER CORPORATION

BUFFALO PUMPS INC

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

CRANE COMPANY

CROWN CORK AND SEAL COMPANY INC

DANA CORPORATION

DURABLA MANUFACTUING COMPANY

FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION

GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES LLC

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (CORPORATION)

GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER CO

GUARDLINE INC

61 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH, J. MARK

Defendant Attorney

LOWERY, JAMES A. III

Other Attorneys

IRVIN, JASON JAMES

FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM

BARRON, BARBARA JANE

RICE, B. STEVE

SMITH, JAMES DAVID

GIBSON, RICK

LEDYARD, DAVID W.

WARE, JAMES L.

ADAMS, ROBERT L.

TIDWELL, JOHN L.

FRASE, LAURA ANN

HALL, JOHN B.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2014
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2008
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2008
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2007
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2006
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2006
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ROACH, CRYSTAL Person Filing - ELLIOTT COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2006
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - OLD, JAMES ROWLAND JR. Person Filing - H B ZACHRY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • SEVERANCE : Filing Attorney - SMITH, J. MARK Person Filing - DEBERRY, CLYDE BENJAMIN

    Read MoreRead Less