This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/19/2020 at 07:37:13 (UTC).

DE LA GARZA, RUBEN vs. KILE, JAMES OLEN

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 DE LA GARZA, RUBEN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KILE, JAMES OLEN. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JUDGE PRESIDING. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1700

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JUDGE PRESIDING

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DLG, A (A MINOR)

DE LA GARZA, RUBEN

DE LA GARZA, SAMANTHA (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIEND OF

Defendant

KILE, JAMES OLEN

Kingwood, TX 77339

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CADENA, JACOB C.

 

Court Documents

Citation Return

06/11/2020: Citation Return

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: KILE, JAMES OLEN; Issued: 5/28/2020; Served: 6/3/2020; Tracking: 73753651; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CADENA, JACOB C.; Person Filing: DE LA GARZA, SAMANTHA (INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NEXT FRIEND OF;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CADENA, JACOB C.; Person Filing: DLG, A (A MINOR);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: CADENA, JACOB C.; Person Filing: DE LA GARZA, RUBEN;

    Read MoreRead Less