This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 12:04:14 (UTC).

DE LA GARZA, JOE vs. UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 DE LA GARZA, JOE filed an Other lawsuit against UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7534

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DE LA GARZA, JOE

Defendant

UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILLER, DAVID R.

Defendant Attorney

BOND, BENTON R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2006
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2006
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2006
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2004
  • ANSWER : Filing Attorney - BOND, BENTON R. Person Filing - UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MILLER, DAVID R. Person Filing - DE LA GARZA, JOE

    Read MoreRead Less