This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/25/2022 at 07:31:18 (UTC).

DAVIS, IDA vs. ABA LEASING LLC

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 DAVIS, IDA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ABA LEASING LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JERALYNN MANOR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9893

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JERALYNN MANOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVIS, IDA

Defendants

ABA LEASING LLC

TRANSCAR EXPRESS LLC

BERNAL, JUAN CARLOS

Others

ABA LEASING LLC MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS REGISTERED AGENT

TRANSCAR EXPRESS LLC (A FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHNS, CHRISTOPHER KELLEY

 

Court Documents

Plaintiffs Original Petition

07/01/2022: Plaintiffs Original Petition

Return of Service Executed

07/19/2022: Return of Service Executed

RETURN OF SERVICE: TRANSCAR EXPRESS LLC:

07/18/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE: TRANSCAR EXPRESS LLC:

Return of Service Executed

07/18/2022: Return of Service Executed

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TRANSCAR EXPRESS LLC (A FOREIGN FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED; Issued: 7/6/2022; Served: 7/18/2022; Tracking: 74023695; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ABA LEASING LLC MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS REGISTERED AGENT; Issued: 7/6/2022; Served: 7/18/2022; Tracking: 74023694; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BERNAL, JUAN CARLOS; Issued: 7/6/2022; Tracking: 74023693; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: JOHNS, CHRISTOPHER KELLEY; Person Filing: DAVIS, IDA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less