This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 11:37:43 (UTC).

DAVILA, JOSE ALBERTO vs. EAGLETON, MYIA C

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 DAVILA, JOSE ALBERTO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EAGLETON, MYIA C. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7353

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVILA, JOSE ALBERTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSEN, PAUL B.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2005
  • ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - THETFORD, CHRISTOPHER L. Person Filing - EAGLETON, MYIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ROSEN, PAUL B. Person Filing - DAVILA, JOSE ALBERTO

    Read MoreRead Less