This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/13/2015 at 02:27:32 (UTC).

DAILEY, DONALD vs. UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION (IND AND AS DBA UNION CA

Case Summary

On 02/21/2005 DAILEY, DONALD filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION IND AND AS DBA UNION CA. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2304

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

DAILEY, DONALD

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

GEORGIA PACIFIC CORPORATION

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES LLC (SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO GARLOCK INC)

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION (IND AND AS DBA UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS AND

UNION CARBIDE CHEMICAL AND PLASTIC INC

MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY

A M F INCORPORATED

AMERICAN OIL COMPANY (FKA AMOCO OIL COMPANY AND AMOCO INC)

AMOCO OIL COMPANY

AMOCO INC

AMERICAN OPITAL CORPORATION

AMETEK INC

AMOCO PRODUCTION COMPANY (FKA PAN AMERICAN PETROLEUM CORPORATION)

PAN AMERICAN PETROLEUM CORPORATION

AQUA CHEM INC (IND AND DBA CLEAVER BROOKS DIVISION)

CLEAVER BROOKS DIVISION

BABCOCK BORSIG POWER INC (FKA DP RILEY INC FKA RILEY STOKER

66 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

PARTIDA-KIPNESS, ROBBIE S.

ANDREWS, PATRICIA KAY

RODRIGUEZ, CHRISTINE MARIE

RHODES, KENNETH D.

FERRELL, MELISSA K.

WADE, TODD N.

STEGALL, JAMES AUBREY III

POWERS, JAMES H.

BOOK, WILLIAM C. JR.

LEVINE, TORI SMITH

TAYLOR, THOMAS W

CALDERON, RAUL M.

WHITE, CLAY M.

ELLISTON, GARY D.

Other Attorneys

STEVENS, RAYMOND LYN

LOWERY, JAMES A. III

PAPPAS, GEORGE P.

ADAMS, KENT M.

TIDWELL, JOHN L.

WILSON, JACKSON D. II

5 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2015
  • ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2008
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2007
  • PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2007
  • ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2005
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - COLLEY, CHRISTOPHER CHAMBLIS Person Filing - DAILEY, DONALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - STEGALL, JAMES AUBREY III Person Filing - H B ZACHRY CORPORATION (SAN ANTONIO)

    Read MoreRead Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FERRELL, MELISSA K. Person Filing - GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES LLC (SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO GARLOCK INC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2005
  • MOTION TRANSFER VENUE : Filing Attorney - STEGALL, JAMES AUBREY III Person Filing - H B ZACHRY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2005
  • ANSWER ALL CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - STEGALL, JAMES AUBREY III Person Filing - ZACHRY CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - STEGALL, JAMES AUBREY III Person Filing - H B ZACHRY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2005
  • ANSWER ALL CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - STEGALL, JAMES AUBREY III Person Filing - H B ZACHRY COMPANY (TEXAS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - STEGALL, JAMES AUBREY III Person Filing - ZACHRY CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - STEGALL, JAMES AUBREY III Person Filing - H B ZACHRY COMPANY (TEXAS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2005
  • MOTION TRANSFER VENUE : Filing Attorney - STEGALL, JAMES AUBREY III Person Filing - H B ZACHRY COMPANY (TEXAS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ADAMS, ROBERT L. Person Filing - CRANE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PARTIDA-KIPNESS, ROBBIE S. Person Filing - DAILEY, DONALD

    Read MoreRead Less