This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/28/2015 at 18:36:53 (UTC).

DAGLE, FRANCIS vs. BEAZER EAST INC

Case Summary

On 04/16/2004 DAGLE, FRANCIS filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against BEAZER EAST INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9731

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

DAGLE, FRANCIS

AMERICAN STANDARD INC

BEAZER EAST INC (FKA KOPPERS CO INC)

KOPPERS CO INC

BEAZER EAST INC

IMO INDUSTRIES INC

SEPCO CORPORATION

RILEY STOKER CORPORATION

FLINTKOTE COMPANY

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC

GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES

FAIRBANKS MORSE PUMP CORPORATION

CRANE CO

A O SMITH CORPORATION

OWENS-ILLINOIS INC

ASTEN GROUP

QUIGLEY COMPANY INC

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC

ZURN INDUSTRIES INC

LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

LANIER, W. MARK

OLD, JAMES ROWLAND JR.

SHIPP, JOHN B.

PRAZAK, JONATHAN R

BOYD, ERNEST W

ELLISTON, GARY D.

HARRIS, JAMES MAYER JR.

FOLEY, JAMES THOMAS III

FAY, LAUREL A.

HARRIS, RAYMOND PAUL JR.

ADAMS, ROBERT L.

CARLSON, ERIC

MOIR, PETER A.

OGDEN, TODD DUANE

HOGAN, TIMOTHY J.

WADE, TODD N.

WRIGHT, ROBIN WADE

SKAGGS, JERAMY MITCHELL

Other Attorneys

HUEBER, SUSAN JAN

DREYER, KIRK DAILEY

6 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2015
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2010
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2007
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2007
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2006
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2006
  • ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - POWERS, JAMES H. Person Filing - BUFFALO PUMPS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2005
  • ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ALMQUIST, ARTHUR RAY Person Filing - THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HARRIS, RAYMOND PAUL JR. Person Filing - FAIRBANKS MORSE PUMP CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FULLER, L. HAYES III Person Filing - GOULS PUMPS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FAY, LAUREL A. Person Filing - GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FOLEY, JAMES THOMAS III Person Filing - CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - JUSTUS, MICHAEL KEITH Person Filing - IMO INDUSTRIES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LOFTIN, STEPHEN MCBRIDE Person Filing - A O SMITH CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LOFTIN, STEPHEN MCBRIDE Person Filing - TH AGRICULTURE & NUTRITION LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WILKINSON, ROBERT W Person Filing - GUARD-LINE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - JACKSON, JESSICA S. Person Filing - A W CHESTERTON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LANIER, W. MARK Person Filing - DAGLE, FRANCIS

    Read MoreRead Less