This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 04/08/2022 at 01:19:29 (UTC).

DADSON, WILLIAM vs. HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

Case Summary

On 01/26/2022 DADSON, WILLIAM filed an Other - Expungement lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is C. ELLIOTT THORNTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4996

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Expungement

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

C. ELLIOTT THORNTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DADSON, WILLIAM

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERK'S OFFICE

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES

HARRIS COUNTY FIRE MARSHAL'S OFFICE

Others

HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY EXPUNCTION UNIT

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE SERVING BRIAN ROSE

HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT CLERKS OFFICE SERVING RANDALL SMIDT

HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES SERVING KELVIN BANKS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LACAYO, BRITTANY CARROLL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • HearingCourt: 164; Docket Type: Law Day Docket; Reason: EXPUNCTION (MOTION FOR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING; Order Signed: 3/30/2022;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LACAYO, BRITTANY CARROLL; Person Filing: DADSON, WILLIAM;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT SERVING MAJOR MAC MCKELVY is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE SERVING BRIAN ROSE is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY PRETRIAL SERVICES is a litigant