This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/08/2021 at 18:21:30 (UTC).

CRUM, TOM vs. 3M COMPANY (AKA MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY)

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 CRUM, TOM filed an Other lawsuit against 3M COMPANY AKA MINNESOTA MINING MANUFACTURING COMPANY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3179

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CRUM, TOM

CRUM, LYNN

Defendants

3M COMPANY (AKA MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY)

ANCO INSULATIONS INC

P O Box 83730 Baton

Rouge, LA 70884

ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY

CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION (FKA COOPER CAMERON CORPORATION)

CHEVRON USA INC

CLEAVER-BROOKS INC (FKA AQUA-CHEM INC) (DBA CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION)

THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY

EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION

FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

PHILLIPS 66 COMPANY

RESCO HOLDINGS LLC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO

RILEY POWER INC (FKA RILEY STOKER CORPORATION AND D B RILEY INC)

SANTA FE BRAU INC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO

SHELL OIL COMPANY

THERMAL INDUSTRIAL INSULATION INC

TRANSOCEAN DRILLING (USA) INC

40 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCDOWELL, DARREN PATRICK

Defendant Attorneys

TERRY, MICHAEL G.

BLIZZARD, JOSEPH

STUDEBAKER, JENNIFER MARIE

LEDYARD, DAVID W.

SLAUGHTER, EDWARD MORRIS

ALMQUIST, ARTHUR RAY

ELLISTON, GARY D.

SANDOVAL, BERNABE GEORGE III

FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM

RHODES, KENNETH D.

HENRY, LESLIE M.

WETWISKA, JAMES ROBERT

EDWARDS, BRADY SHERROD

LOPEZ, MARY LAURA

Other Attorneys

BARRON, BARBARA JANE

 

Court Documents

Defendant, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporations' Certificate Of Written Discovery (Application Only To Equipment manufacturer Defendants)

10/07/2021: Defendant, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporations' Certificate Of Written Discovery (Application Only To Equipment manufacturer Defendants)

Phillips 66 Company's Certificate of Written Discovery

09/13/2021: Phillips 66 Company's Certificate of Written Discovery

Citation-Anco Insulations Inc 73893521

08/12/2021: Citation-Anco Insulations Inc 73893521

Defendant Cameron International Corporation's Original Answer

08/16/2021: Defendant Cameron International Corporation's Original Answer

Certificate Of Filing Written Discovery

08/19/2021: Certificate Of Filing Written Discovery

Atlantic Richfield Company and BP Corporation North America INC'S Original Answer

08/19/2021: Atlantic Richfield Company and BP Corporation North America INC'S Original Answer

DEFENDANT CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC. f/k/a AQUA-CHEM, INC. d/b/a CLEAVERBROOKS DIVISION?S SPECIAL APPEARANCE AND, SUBJECT THERETO,

08/20/2021: DEFENDANT CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC. f/k/a AQUA-CHEM, INC. d/b/a CLEAVERBROOKS DIVISION?S SPECIAL APPEARANCE AND, SUBJECT THERETO,

Defendant Riley Power Inc.'s F/K/A Riley Stroker Corporation and D.B. Riley INC'S Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claim On The Basis Of Forum Non Conveniens; and, Subject To and Without Waiving Foregoing Answer To Plaintiff's First Amended Petition and Jur

08/23/2021: Defendant Riley Power Inc.'s F/K/A Riley Stroker Corporation and D.B. Riley INC'S Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claim On The Basis Of Forum Non Conveniens; and, Subject To and Without Waiving Foregoing Answer To Plaintiff's First Amended Petition and Jur

Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Motion To Transfer Venue

09/03/2021: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Motion To Transfer Venue

Citation Request Form - Resco

07/19/2021: Citation Request Form - Resco

Citation Request Form - Exxon

07/19/2021: Citation Request Form - Exxon

Citation Request Form - 3M

07/19/2021: Citation Request Form - 3M

Exhibit A

07/19/2021: Exhibit A

Citation Request Form - Viacombs

07/20/2021: Citation Request Form - Viacombs

Citation Request Form - Trans Drilling

07/20/2021: Citation Request Form - Trans Drilling

Citation Request Form - FW

07/20/2021: Citation Request Form - FW

Citation Request Form - Cleaver-Brooks

07/20/2021: Citation Request Form - Cleaver-Brooks

Citation Request Form- Santa Fe Braun, Inc.

07/27/2021: Citation Request Form- Santa Fe Braun, Inc.

103 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RHODES, KENNETH D.; Person Filing: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: SUGGESTION OF DEATH; Filing Attorney: MCDOWELL, DARREN PATRICK; Person Filing: CRUM, TOM;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, BRADY SHERROD; Person Filing: SANTA FE BRAUN INC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WETWISKA, JAMES ROBERT; Person Filing: RESCO HOLDINGS LLC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL ANSWER; Filing Attorney: TERRY, MICHAEL G.; Person Filing: 3M COMPANY (AKA MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, BRADY SHERROD; Person Filing: SHELL OIL COMPANY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ELLISTON, GARY D.; Person Filing: RILEY POWER INC (FKA RILEY STOKER CORPORATION AND D B RILEY INC);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SANDOVAL, BERNABE GEORGE III; Person Filing: FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SLAUGHTER, EDWARD MORRIS; Person Filing: CLEAVER-BROOKS DIVISION;

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TRANSOCEAN DRILLING U K LIMITED (F/K/A GLOBAL SANTAFE DRILLING U K; Issued: 7/22/2021; Served: 7/28/2021; Received: 8/20/2021; Tracking: 73893451; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING; Issued: 7/22/2021; Tracking: 73893445; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TRANSOCEAN DRILLING (USA) INC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING; Issued: 7/22/2021; Served: 7/28/2021; Received: 8/20/2021; Tracking: 73893438; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: VIACOMCBS INC (F/K/A CBS CORP) (F/K/A VIACOM INC) (SUED ASSUCCESSOR-; Issued: 7/22/2021; Served: 7/27/2021; Received: 8/9/2021; Tracking: 73893436; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BP CORPORATION NORTH AMERICA INC (F/K/A AMOCO CORPORATION); Issued: 7/22/2021; Served: 7/27/2021; Received: 7/30/2021; Tracking: 73893435; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: 3M COMPANY (A/K/A MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY BY SERVING; Issued: 7/22/2021; Served: 7/27/2021; Received: 8/9/2021; Tracking: 73893414; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCDOWELL, DARREN PATRICK; Person Filing: CRUM, LYNN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCDOWELL, DARREN PATRICK; Person Filing: CRUM, TOM;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCDOWELL, DARREN PATRICK; Person Filing: CRUM, TOM;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCDOWELL, DARREN PATRICK; Person Filing: CRUM, LYNN;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PHILLIPS 66 COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CLEAVER BROOKS CO is a litigant

Latest cases where ANCO INSULATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Renco Holdings, Inc. is a litigant