This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 12:06:37 (UTC).

CRST MALONE INC (FKA MALONE FREIGHT LINES INC) vs. HADDOX &NEIDERHOLDER (A TEXAS GENERAL PARTNERSHIP)

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 CRST MALONE INC FKA MALONE FREIGHT LINES INC filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against HADDOX NEIDERHOLDER A TEXAS GENERAL PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7540

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CRST MALONE INC (FKA MALONE FREIGHT LINES INC)

MALONE FREIGHT LINES INC

Defendants

HADDOX &NEIDERHOLDER (A TEXAS GENERAL PARTNERSHIP)

HADDOX, RONALD

NEIDERHOFER, THOMAS A

HADDOX &NIEDERHOFER (A TEXAS GENERAL PARTNERSHIP)

NIEDERHOFER, THOMAS A

HADDOX & NIEDERHOFER (A TEXAS GENERAL PARTNERSHIP)

CREST MALONE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

BRADLEY, JAMES E.

PARK, RICHARD W.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2010
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2010
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2010
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2010
  • MOTION TO REMOVE TRIAL READY STATUS GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2005
  • SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BRADLEY, JAMES E. Person Filing - MALONE FREIGHT LINES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2005
  • SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BRADLEY, JAMES E. Person Filing - CRST MALONE INC (FKA MALONE FREIGHT LINES INC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2005
  • RESPONSE MOTION TRANSFER VENUE : Filing Attorney - BRADLEY, JAMES E. Person Filing - CREST MALONE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PARK, RICHARD W. Person Filing - HADDOX, RONALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PARK, RICHARD W. Person Filing - HADDOX &NEIDERHOLDER; (A TEXAS GENERAL PARTNERSHIP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PARK, RICHARD W. Person Filing - HADDOX & NIEDERHOFER (A TEXAS GENERAL PARTNERSHIP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PARK, RICHARD W. Person Filing - HADDOX &NIEDERHOFER; (A TEXAS GENERAL PARTNERSHIP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PARK, RICHARD W. Person Filing - HADDOX & NEIDERHOFER (A TEXAS GENERAL PARTNERSHIP) BY SERVING ONE OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2004
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BRADLEY, JAMES E. Person Filing - MALONE FREIGHT LINES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2004
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BRADLEY, JAMES E. Person Filing - CRST MALONE INC (FKA MALONE FREIGHT LINES INC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BRADLEY, JAMES E. Person Filing - CRST MALONE INC (FKA MALONE FREIGHT LINES INC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BRADLEY, JAMES E. Person Filing - MALONE FREIGHT LINES INC

    Read MoreRead Less