This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/24/2015 at 11:42:13 (UTC).

CROSSTIMBERS REALTY CORP (AS THE PROPERT vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 08/30/2004 CROSSTIMBERS REALTY CORP AS THE PROPERT filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7387

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CROSSTIMBERS REALTY CORP (AS THE PROPERTY OWNERS)

PROPERTY OWNERS

Defendants

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

APPRAISAL REVIEW BOARD OF HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCKENNEY, HUGH L.

Defendant Attorney

WALL, KENNETH E. JR.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2006
  • ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2006
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2006
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2006
  • SETTLED/NON-SUITED (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2006
  • EVIDENCE PRESENTED-NON JURY (EACH DAY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2006
  • TO TRIAL ON MERITS (NON JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2006
  • JUDGMENT RENDERED BY COURT AFTER TRIAL (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2004
  • ANSWER : Filing Attorney - WALL, KENNETH E. JR. Person Filing - HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MCKENNEY, HUGH L. Person Filing - PROPERTY OWNERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MCKENNEY, HUGH L. Person Filing - CROSSTIMBERS REALTY CORP (AS THE PROPERTY OWNERS)

    Read MoreRead Less