This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/05/2020 at 08:31:52 (UTC).

CROSBY, VANCE vs. CHAMPION CARTAGE COMPANY INC

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 CROSBY, VANCE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CHAMPION CARTAGE COMPANY INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KYLE CARTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5601

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KYLE CARTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROSBY, VANCE

Defendants

STRICK TRAILERS LLC

CHAMPION CARTAGE COMPANY INC

PREMIER TRAILER LEASING INC

PREMIER TRAILER LEASING I LLC

Others

PREMIER TRAILER LEASING INC (DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY)

701 Brazos Street Suite 720

Austin, TX 78701

PREMIER TRAILER LEASING I LLC (DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY)

5201 Tennyson Parkway Suite 250

Plano, TX 75024

CHAMPION CARTAGE COMPANY INC (DOMESTIC FOR PROFIT CORPORATION)

14006 Chevy Chase

Houston, TX 77077

STRICK TRAILERS LLC (DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY)

225 Lincoln Highway Fairless

Hills, PA 19030

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IVEY, JACK TODD

 

Court Documents

Service Return

09/18/2020: Service Return

Service Return

09/24/2020: Service Return

Citation

09/30/2020: Citation

Citation

09/30/2020: Citation

PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

09/11/2020: PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PREMIER TRAILER LEASING INC (DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY); Issued: 9/15/2020; Served: 9/16/2020; Received: 9/24/2020; Tracking: 73787325; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PREMIER TRAILER LEASING I LLC (DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY); Issued: 9/15/2020; Served: 9/16/2020; Tracking: 73787318; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (SECRETARY OF STATE NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: STRICK TRAILERS LLC (DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY); Issued: 9/15/2020; Served: 9/16/2020; Tracking: 73787299; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CHAMPION CARTAGE COMPANY INC (DOMESTIC FOR PROFIT CORPORATION); Issued: 9/15/2020; Served: 9/18/2020; Received: 9/21/2020; Tracking: 73787273; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: IVEY, JACK TODD; Person Filing: CROSBY, VANCE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Premier Trailer Leasing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Strick Trailers LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer IVEY JACK TODD