This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:45:51 (UTC).

CREDIGY RECEIVABLES INC vs. VILLEGAS, YVONNE

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 CREDIGY RECEIVABLES INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VILLEGAS, YVONNE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1579

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIGY RECEIVABLES INC

Defendant

VILLEGAS, YVONNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DITSCH, KAREN ANN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2006
  • PLAINTIFF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2006
  • DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - DITSCH, KAREN ANN Person Filing - CREDIGY RECEIVABLES INC

    Read MoreRead Less