This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 02/06/2021 at 07:58:47 (UTC).

CRAWFORD CONDOMINIUMS LP (D/B/A PARC AT MIDTOWN) vs. AMTRUST INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS DAC (A/K/A AMTRUST INTERNATIONAL

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 CRAWFORD CONDOMINIUMS LP D/B/A PARC AT MIDTOWN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMTRUST INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS DAC A/K/A AMTRUST INTERNATIONAL. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MIKE ENGELHART. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2080

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MIKE ENGELHART

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PARC AT MIDTOWN

CRAWFORD CONDOMINIUMS LP (D/B/A PARC AT MIDTOWN)

Defendants

AMTRUST INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS DAC (A/K/A AMTRUST INTERNATIONAL

AMTRUST INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS LIMITED

Other

AMTRUST INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS DAC (A/K/A AMTRUST

800 Superior Ave E 21St Floor

Cleveland, OH 44114

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARDS, JAMES STEPHEN

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of Service

02/03/2021: Affidavit of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

01/13/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Civil Case Information Sheet

01/13/2021: Civil Case Information Sheet

Crawford Condominiums Lp D/B/A Plaintiffs Original Petition and Request for Disclosure

01/13/2021: Crawford Condominiums Lp D/B/A Plaintiffs Original Petition and Request for Disclosure

Letter to Clerk

01/14/2021: Letter to Clerk

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (INSURANCE COMMISSION); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: AMTRUST INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS DAC (A/K/A AMTRUST; Issued: 1/20/2021; Served: 1/27/2021; Tracking: 73832826; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RICHARDS, JAMES STEPHEN; Person Filing: PARC AT MIDTOWN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: RICHARDS, JAMES STEPHEN; Person Filing: CRAWFORD CONDOMINIUMS LP (D/B/A PARC AT MIDTOWN);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMTRUST INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS LTD. is a litigant