This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:18:56 (UTC).

COUTURIE, PETER vs. SONSUB INC

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 COUTURIE, PETER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SONSUB INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0677

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COUTURIE, PETER

PARJUS, ANTONIO

ALPUNAER, KAYA

Defendants

SONSUB INC

SAIPEM S P A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOEG, MATTHEW LUKE

Defendant Attorney

HUMPHRIES, SCOTT A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2006
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2006
  • DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HUMPHRIES, SCOTT A. Person Filing - SONSUB INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2005
  • ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL IN PART SIGNED SEE ORDR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2005
  • ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2005
  • TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2005
  • TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED RECUSING JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2005
  • MOTION NEW TRIAL : Filing Attorney - HUMPHRIES, SCOTT A. Person Filing - ALPUNAER, KAYA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2005
  • MOTION NEW TRIAL : Filing Attorney - HUMPHRIES, SCOTT A. Person Filing - COUTURIE, PETER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2005
  • MOTION NEW TRIAL : Filing Attorney - HUMPHRIES, SCOTT A. Person Filing - PARJUS, ANTONIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HUMPHRIES, SCOTT A. Person Filing - SAIPEM S P A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2005
  • INTERLOCUTORY DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HOEG, MATTHEW LUKE Person Filing - ALPUNAER, KAYA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HOEG, MATTHEW LUKE Person Filing - COUTURIE, PETER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HOEG, MATTHEW LUKE Person Filing - PARJUS, ANTONIO

    Read MoreRead Less