This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 01/28/2021 at 07:28:18 (UTC).

COURTNEY, DEWEY vs. AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP

Case Summary

On 01/04/2021 COURTNEY, DEWEY filed an Other lawsuit against AIR LIQUID SYSTEMS CORP. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0099

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COURTNEY, DEWEY

Defendants

CRANE ENVIRONMENTAL INC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-

CRANE CO (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO

VIACOMCBS INC (F/K/A CBS CORP) (A DELAWARE CORP) (F/K/A

PNEUMO ABEX LLC (SUED AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO ABEX CORP)

AMTROL INC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO

RAYTHEON TECHNOLOGIES CORP

VIRGINIA ELECTRIC AND POWDER CO FOR ITS NORTH

WEIR VALVES & & CONTROLS USA INC

GOULDS ELECTRONICS INC (SUED AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST

BLOCK DRUG CO INC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC (F/K/A ALLIED-SIGNAL INC)

MARTIN HIMMEL INC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO

PFIZER INC

EATON HYDRAULICS LLC (F/K/A EATON HYDRAULICS) (SUED AS SUED

DOMINION ENERGY INC FOR ITS NORTH POWER STATION

ITT CORP

IMO INDUSTRIES INC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST

CHATTEM INC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST

WARREN PUMPS LLC

46 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MONTEMAYOR, JENNIFER IVETT

Defendant Attorneys

VARSHOSAZ, ARTOUSH

ELLISTON, GARY D.

PEVSNER, JOSEPH STUART

FRAZIER, MARY ELIZONDO

PRAZAK, JONATHAN ROSS

Other Attorneys

EDWARDS, BRADY SHERROD

ROBINSON, JOHN R.

BARRON, BARBARA JANE

WEHRMANN, HENRY

FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM

THOMPSON, JAMES M.

WRIGHT, DAWN MARIE

PRESSON, ASHLEY RENEE

HORNE, NATHAN RAY

STEVENS, RAYMOND LYN

 

Court Documents

Exhibit B

01/04/2021: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

01/04/2021: Exhibit A

Notice of Transfer Under Rule 13 of Tag-Along Case

01/04/2021: Notice of Transfer Under Rule 13 of Tag-Along Case

Cover Letter

01/05/2021: Cover Letter

AutoZone, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue, Special Exception and Original Answer

01/05/2021: AutoZone, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue, Special Exception and Original Answer

Filing letter

01/06/2021: Filing letter

Defendant General Electric Company's Motion To Dismiss For Forum Non Conveniens, Motion to Transfer Venue, Special Exceptions, and Subject Thereto, Original Answer, and Answer To All Cross Action

01/06/2021: Defendant General Electric Company's Motion To Dismiss For Forum Non Conveniens, Motion to Transfer Venue, Special Exceptions, and Subject Thereto, Original Answer, and Answer To All Cross Action

Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC'S Special Exceptions, and Subject Thereto, Its Motion To Dismiss For Forum Non Conveniens, Original Answer To Plaintffs' Original Petition Cross-Claim, and Answer To Allk Cross-Claims

01/07/2021: Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC'S Special Exceptions, and Subject Thereto, Its Motion To Dismiss For Forum Non Conveniens, Original Answer To Plaintffs' Original Petition Cross-Claim, and Answer To Allk Cross-Claims

Defendant IMO Industries INC.'S Special Exceptions, and Subject Thereto, Its Motion To Dismiss For Forum Non Conveniens, Original Answer To Plaintiffs' Original Petition, Cross-Claim, and Answer To All Cross-Claims

01/07/2021: Defendant IMO Industries INC.'S Special Exceptions, and Subject Thereto, Its Motion To Dismiss For Forum Non Conveniens, Original Answer To Plaintiffs' Original Petition, Cross-Claim, and Answer To All Cross-Claims

Defendant, Genuine Parts Company's Motion To Transfer Venue Subject To Said Motion, Defendant's Special Exceptions, Original Answer and Answer To all Cross-Actions

01/07/2021: Defendant, Genuine Parts Company's Motion To Transfer Venue Subject To Said Motion, Defendant's Special Exceptions, Original Answer and Answer To all Cross-Actions

Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Transfer Venue, Special Exceptions, and Subject Thereto, Original Answer and Answer To All Cross Actions

01/07/2021: Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Transfer Venue, Special Exceptions, and Subject Thereto, Original Answer and Answer To All Cross Actions

Defendant Crane Co. and Crane Environmental, INC.'S Special Appearance, and Subject Thereto, Answer To Plaintiffs' Most Recent Petition, Answer To Cross Actions and/or Third Party Actions

01/08/2021: Defendant Crane Co. and Crane Environmental, INC.'S Special Appearance, and Subject Thereto, Answer To Plaintiffs' Most Recent Petition, Answer To Cross Actions and/or Third Party Actions

Defendant SPX Corporation, As Successor In Interest To Kinney Vacuum Pump Company's Motion To Transfer Venue Motion To Dismiss For Forum Non Conveniens and Original Answer, Subject Thereto To Plaintiffs' Original Petition

01/08/2021: Defendant SPX Corporation, As Successor In Interest To Kinney Vacuum Pump Company's Motion To Transfer Venue Motion To Dismiss For Forum Non Conveniens and Original Answer, Subject Thereto To Plaintiffs' Original Petition

Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Barrets Minerals INC.

01/11/2021: Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Barrets Minerals INC.

Defendant Parker Hannifin Corporations's Original Answer Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Petition

01/11/2021: Defendant Parker Hannifin Corporations's Original Answer Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Petition

Defendant ITT LLC'S Original Answer To Plaintiffs' Original Petition and Jury Demand

01/11/2021: Defendant ITT LLC'S Original Answer To Plaintiffs' Original Petition and Jury Demand

DEFENDANT PFIZER INCS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND SUBJECT THERETO ORIGINAL ANSWER SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND JURY DEMAND TO PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION AND REQUESTS FOR DISCLOSURE TO PLAINTIFFS

01/11/2021: DEFENDANT PFIZER INCS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND SUBJECT THERETO ORIGINAL ANSWER SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND JURY DEMAND TO PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION AND REQUESTS FOR DISCLOSURE TO PLAINTIFFS

Defendant Alfa Laval Inc.'s Special Appearance

01/11/2021: Defendant Alfa Laval Inc.'s Special Appearance

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BARRON, BARBARA JANE; Person Filing: WILLIAM POWER CO;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PRESSON, ASHLEY RENEE; Person Filing: TACO INC.;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PEVSNER, JOSEPH STUART; Person Filing: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC (F/K/A ALLIED-SIGNAL INC);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ELLISTON, GARY D.; Person Filing: PNEUMO ABEX LLC (SUED AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO ABEX CORP);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM; Person Filing: VIACOM INC (SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO CBS CORP);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ROBINSON, JOHN R.; Person Filing: VELAN VALVE CORP (A/K/A VELAN VALVE CORP);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: THOMPSON, JAMES MICHAEL; Person Filing: PARKER-HANNIFIN CORP;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FRAZIER, MARY ELIZONDO; Person Filing: BARRETTS MINERALS INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WRIGHT, DAWN MARIE; Person Filing: FORD MOTOR CO;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PRAZAK, JONATHAN ROSS; Person Filing: WARREN PUMPS LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: STEVENS, RAYMOND LYN; Person Filing: GENUINE PARTS CO (A/K/A NAPA);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PRAZAK, JONATHAN ROSS; Person Filing: IMO INDUSTRIES INC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM; Person Filing: GENERAL ELECTRIC CO;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WEHRMANN, HENRY; Person Filing: AUTOZONE INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MONTEMAYOR, JENNIFER IVETT; Person Filing: COURTNEY, DEWEY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MONTEMAYOR, JENNIFER IVETT; Person Filing: COURTNEY, KIMBERLY;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARTIN HIMMEL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where EATON-HYDRAULICS INDIVIDUALLY & AS is a litigant

Latest cases where WARREN PUMPS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where AMTROL INC. is a litigant