This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/30/2020 at 07:57:10 (UTC).

COUNTY OF WILSON AND WILSON COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPIT vs. ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC

Case Summary

On 07/06/2020 COUNTY OF WILSON AND WILSON COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPIT filed an Other lawsuit against ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT K. SCHAFFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9831

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT K. SCHAFFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COUNTY OF WILSON AND WILSON COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPIT

Defendants

MCKESSON CORPORATION

MYLAN INSTITUTIONAL INC

MYLAN INC

MALINKCKRODT LLC

MALLINCKRODT PLC

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

ABBVIE INC

MISSION PHARMACAL COMPANY

CEPHALON INC

MYLAN SPECIALTY L P

ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC

ACTAVIS LLC

ALLERGAN PLC (F/K/A ACTAVIS PLC)

MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC

TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD

MCKESSON MEDICAL-SURGICAL INC

MYLAN BERTEK PHARMACEUTICALS INC

ACTAVIS PHARMA INC (F/K/A WATSON PHARMA INC)

ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC (F/K/A ACTAVIS INC F/K/A WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS INC

19 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIBISKI, HANNAH DEMARCO

Defendant Attorneys

SMYSER, CRAIG

BOYCE, MARIA WYCKOFF

MCCLEARY, ROGER L.

MCCONNICO, STEPHEN E.

Other Attorneys

WILKES, JOHN LAURENS

MENGIS, MICHAEL W.

PATTERSON, NANCY L.

PERRY, CHARLES STANTON

DURFEE, MATTHEW ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Defendant Watson Laboratories, Inc;s Original Answer And Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Petition

07/13/2020: Defendant Watson Laboratories, Inc;s Original Answer And Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Petition

Defendants Jassen Pharmaceuticals, INC and Johnson & Johnson's Answer to Plaintiffs Original Petition and Request for Disclosures

07/13/2020: Defendants Jassen Pharmaceuticals, INC and Johnson & Johnson's Answer to Plaintiffs Original Petition and Request for Disclosures

Defendants Cardinal Health, INC. and Cardinal Health 110, LLC's Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses to County of Wilson and Wilson County Memorial Hospital District's Original Petition and Request for Disclosures

07/17/2020: Defendants Cardinal Health, INC. and Cardinal Health 110, LLC's Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses to County of Wilson and Wilson County Memorial Hospital District's Original Petition and Request for Disclosures

Noramco's Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses

07/17/2020: Noramco's Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses

The Mylan Defendants' Original Answer and Request for Disclosure

07/17/2020: The Mylan Defendants' Original Answer and Request for Disclosure

Defendant Mallinckrodt LLC's Original Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Petition

07/17/2020: Defendant Mallinckrodt LLC's Original Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Petition

Defendant Assertio Therapuetics, Inc. F/K/A Depomed, Inc's Original Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Petition

07/17/2020: Defendant Assertio Therapuetics, Inc. F/K/A Depomed, Inc's Original Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Petition

ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC AND ENDO HEALTH SOULUTIONS INC.'S ORIGINAL ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETIITONT AND JURY DEMAND

07/20/2020: ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC AND ENDO HEALTH SOULUTIONS INC.'S ORIGINAL ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETIITONT AND JURY DEMAND

PAR PHARMACEUTICAL INC AND PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIESINCS ORIGINAL ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION AND JURY DEMAND

07/20/2020: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL INC AND PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIESINCS ORIGINAL ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION AND JURY DEMAND

Proposed Order Sustaining Defendant Mallinckrodt PLC's Special Appearance

07/24/2020: Proposed Order Sustaining Defendant Mallinckrodt PLC's Special Appearance

Exhibit 1 - Affidavit

07/24/2020: Exhibit 1 - Affidavit

Appendix G- Original Petition

07/06/2020: Appendix G- Original Petition

Appendix B-List of all parties who have not yet appeared in the case

07/06/2020: Appendix B-List of all parties who have not yet appeared in the case

Appendix E

07/07/2020: Appendix E

Appendix D

07/07/2020: Appendix D

Appendix G

07/07/2020: Appendix G

County of Wilson - Amended Notice of Transfer of Tag-Along Case

07/07/2020: County of Wilson - Amended Notice of Transfer of Tag-Along Case

Knoll Pharmaceutical Company and Abbvie INC's Answer and Affirmative and Other Defenses

07/10/2020: Knoll Pharmaceutical Company and Abbvie INC's Answer and Affirmative and Other Defenses

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCCLEARY, ROGER L.; Person Filing: SPECGX LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SIBISKI, HANNAH DEMARCO; Person Filing: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SIBISKI, HANNAH DEMARCO; Person Filing: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SIBISKI, HANNAH DEMARCO; Person Filing: ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BOYCE, MARIA WYCKOFF; Person Filing: MYLAN BERTEK PHARMACEUTICALS INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BOYCE, MARIA WYCKOFF; Person Filing: MYLAN SPECIALTY L P;

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PERRY, CHARLES STANTON; Person Filing: AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORPORATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCCONNICO, STEPHEN E.; Person Filing: ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC (N/K/A JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCCONNICO, STEPHEN E.; Person Filing: JOHNSON & JOHNSON;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SMYSER, CRAIG; Person Filing: MCKESSON CORPORATION;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PATTERSON, NANCY L.; Person Filing: WATSON LABORATORIES INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SMYSER, CRAIG; Person Filing: MCKESSON MEDICAL-SURGICAL INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCCONNICO, STEPHEN E.; Person Filing: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC (F/K/A ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WILKES, JOHN LAURENS; Person Filing: KNOLL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SIBISKI, HANNAH DEMARCO; Person Filing: COUNTY OF WILSON AND WILSON COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPIT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SIBISKI, HANNAH DEMARCO; Person Filing: COUNTY OF WILSON AND WILSON COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPIT;

    Read MoreRead Less