This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/27/2021 at 07:57:16 (UTC).

COTTON, DONTRELL vs. GREATER HOUSTON TRANSPORTATION COMPANY (DBA AND/OR AKA YELLOW CAB

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 COTTON, DONTRELL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GREATER HOUSTON TRANSPORTATION COMPANY DBA AND/OR AKA YELLOW CAB. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6912

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COTTON, DONTRELL

Defendants and Others

GREATER HOUSTON TRANSPORTATION COMPANY (DBA AND/OR AKA YELLOW CAB

1415 Louisiana St 22Nd Floor

Houston, TX 77002

MAYBERRY, CARLOS

Houston, TX 77083

ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY

YELLOW CAB COMPANY

YELLOW CAB

UNITED CAB COMPANY

UNITED TRANSPORTATION SERVICES

UNITED TRANSPORTATION SERVICES INC

ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY (AN INSURANCE COMPANY) MAY BE SERVED WITH

1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TERRY, TRAVIS BARTON

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of Service-Allstate Indemnity Company

09/13/2021: Affidavit of Service-Allstate Indemnity Company

Citation Return-Greater Houston Transportation Company.

09/15/2021: Citation Return-Greater Houston Transportation Company.

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

09/03/2021: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

09/03/2021: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

09/03/2021: REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SERVICE

CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET

09/03/2021: CIVIL CASE INFORMATION SHEET

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

09/03/2021: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY (AN INSURANCE COMPANY) MAY BE SERVED WITH; Issued: 9/8/2021; Served: 9/10/2021; Tracking: 73912441; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: GREATER HOUSTON TRANSPORTATION COMPANY (DBA AND/OR AKA YELLOW CAB; Issued: 9/8/2021; Served: 9/13/2021; Tracking: 73912430; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: MAYBERRY, CARLOS; Issued: 9/8/2021; Tracking: 73912417; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: TERRY, TRAVIS BARTON; Person Filing: COTTON, DONTRELL;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Cab LLC, a California Limited Liability Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Greater Houston Transportation Co is a litigant

Latest cases where YELLOW CAB CO is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Indemnity Company is a litigant