This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:09:41 (UTC).

COTTINGHAM, ANDRE CARROLL vs. SATTERFIELD, JENNIFER ANN

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 COTTINGHAM, ANDRE CARROLL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SATTERFIELD, JENNIFER ANN. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8107

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COTTINGHAM, ANDRE CARROLL

Defendant

SATTERFIELD, JENNIFER ANN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2005
  • DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2004
  • ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2004
  • TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2004
  • TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • PAUPER'S OATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less