Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/10/2015 at 11:39:27 (UTC).

COSTLOW, BOBBY L vs. 3M (FKA MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/17/2005 COSTLOW, BOBBY L filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against 3M FKA MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3293

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

COSTLOW, BOBBY L

3M (FKA MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY)

LAWSON, FRANCES

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

MINNESOTA MINING AND MAUFACTURING COMPANY

3M (F/K/A MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY)

DIAMOND BLAST INDUSTRIES ( D/B/A DEPENDABLE ABRASIVES INC)

KELCO SALES & ENGINEERING

LONE STAR INDUSTRIES INC

PRECISION PACKAGING INC

DRILLING SPECIALTIES COMPANY

PHILLIPS CHEMICALHOLDINGS (A/K/A DRILLING SPECIALTIES COMAPNY)

P P G INDUSTRIES INC

AMERICAN COLLOID COMPANY

HERCULES INCORPORATED

BAKER CHEMICALS INC

FICTITIOUS PARTIES ( JOHN DOE DEFENDANTS)

VITRO CHEMICALS , FIBERS & MINING INC

SOLVAY MINERALS INC

DEPENDABLE ABRASIVES INC

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN, RUSSELL CLAY

Defendant Attorneys

RHODES, KENNETH D.

WEBB, WILLIAM CURTIS

BEASON, RYAN A.

WARE, JAMES L.

BARRON, BARBARA JANE

WALKER, JOHN R

LANDRY, ANDRE M. III

ANDERSON, ROGER WILLIAM

VANCE, VANESSA LEE

HOUSE, JOHN HOWELL JR.

JONES, KELLI CHISM

EWING, JERRY L. JR.

DODSON, JOE MICHAEL

Other Attorneys

GUILFOYLE, MATTHEW

DERDEN, ALBERT CHRISTOPHER

ROSE, ROBERT J. SR.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2014
  • DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2011
  • ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2007
  • PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON AGREEMENT OF PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - DODSON, JOE MICHAEL Person Filing - DEPENDABLE ABRASIVES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WALKER, JOHN R Person Filing - DRILLING SPECIALTIES COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2005
  • ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - RHODES, KENNETH D. Person Filing - METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2005
  • CROSS ACTION : Filing Attorney - RHODES, KENNETH D. Person Filing - METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WEBB, WILLIAM CURTIS Person Filing - MINNESOTA MINING AND MAUFACTURING COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - WEBB, WILLIAM CURTIS Person Filing - 3M (F/K/A MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BROWN, RUSSELL CLAY Person Filing - LAWSON, FRANCES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BROWN, RUSSELL CLAY Person Filing - COSTLOW, BOBBY L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2005
  • ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BROWN, RUSSELL CLAY Person Filing - LAWSON, FRANCES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BROWN, RUSSELL CLAY Person Filing - COSTLOW, BOBBY L

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Precision Packaging Products Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN COLLOID COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where PPG INDUSTRIES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where HERCULES INC is a litigant