This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:18:45 (UTC).

CORNEJO, JUAN PEDRO vs. GLENN SKATES INC

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 CORNEJO, JUAN PEDRO filed an Other lawsuit against GLENN SKATES INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0676

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CORNEJO, JUAN PEDRO

CORNEJJO, FRANSICA

Defendants

GLENN SKATES INC

LONG LAKE LTD

SKATES MANAGEMENT INC

SKATES HOUSTON L L P

U S SURVEYING COMPANY INC

CENTERPOINT ENERGY INC

U S SURVEYING INC (CORPORATION)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KLITSAS, LOREN GEORGE

Defendant Attorneys

GARZA, BERNARDO S.

SIMMONS, JAMES E.

ROSENBERG, MARSHALL G.

ANAIPAKOS, IOANNIS VASILIOS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2006
  • ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2006
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GARZA, BERNARDO S. Person Filing - GLENN SKATES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2005
  • SECOND AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SIMMONS, JAMES E. Person Filing - LONG LAKE LTD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GARZA, BERNARDO S. Person Filing - SKATES MANAGEMENT INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GARZA, BERNARDO S. Person Filing - SKATES HOUSTON L L P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2005
  • SIXTH AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KLITSAS, LOREN GEORGE Person Filing - CORNEJJO, FRANSICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2005
  • SIXTH AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KLITSAS, LOREN GEORGE Person Filing - CORNEJO, JUAN PEDRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2005
  • FIFTH AMENDED ORIGINAL : Filing Attorney - VERCHER, J. RONALD Person Filing - CORNEJJO, FRANSICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2005
  • FIFTH AMENDED ORIGINAL : Filing Attorney - VERCHER, J. RONALD Person Filing - CORNEJO, JUAN PEDRO

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2005
  • SECOND AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KLITSAS, LOREN GEORGE Person Filing - CORNEJO, JUAN PEDRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KLITSAS, LOREN GEORGE Person Filing - CORNEJO, JUAN PEDRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2005
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2005
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - GARZA, BERNARDO S. Person Filing - GLENN SKATES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • JURY DEMAND MADE (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - KLITSAS, LOREN GEORGE Person Filing - CORNEJO, JUAN PEDRO

    Read MoreRead Less