This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:09:48 (UTC).

CORDERO, ISAIAS vs. DUNCAN, JUDY MAE

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 CORDERO, ISAIAS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DUNCAN, JUDY MAE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0394

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORDERO, ISAIAS

Defendant

DUNCAN, JUDY MAE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAMIREZ, KARINA A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2005
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2005
  • EVIDENCE PRESENTED-NON JURY (EACH DAY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2005
  • SETTLED/NON-SUITED (NON-JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2005
  • ORDER GRANTING STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2005
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2005
  • TO TRIAL ON MERITS (NON JURY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2005
  • ORDER SIGNED AWARDING ATTORNEY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2005
  • ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - RAMIREZ, KARINA A Person Filing - CORDERO, ISAIAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - RAMIREZ, KARINA A Person Filing - CORDERO, ISAIAS

    Read MoreRead Less