This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 06/18/2015 at 23:21:42 (UTC).

COOPER, KAREN vs. FITZGERALD, RAY M (M D)

Case Summary

On 12/02/2004 COOPER, KAREN filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against FITZGERALD, RAY M M D. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8562

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COOPER, KAREN

Defendants

FITZGERALD, RAY M (M D)

KSF ORTHOPAEDIC CENTER P A

K S F ORTHOPAEDIC CENTER P A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVIS, JOHN A. JR.

Defendant Attorney

HOUSTON, SAMUEL A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2006
  • EACH PAY OWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2006
  • AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2005
  • HOLD FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2005
  • DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2005
  • DESIGNATED TRIAL READY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2004
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - DAVIS, JOHN A. JR. Person Filing - COOPER, KAREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HOUSTON, SAMUEL A. Person Filing - K S F ORTHOPAEDIC CENTER P A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HOUSTON, SAMUEL A. Person Filing - KSF ORTHOPAEDIC CENTER P A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2004
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - HOUSTON, SAMUEL A. Person Filing - FITZGERALD, RAY M (M D)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2004
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - DAVIS, JOHN A. JR. Person Filing - COOPER, KAREN

    Read MoreRead Less