This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/11/2015 at 14:30:56 (UTC).

CONSTANTE, RAYMOND vs. A W CHESTERTON CO

Case Summary

On 10/17/2005 CONSTANTE, RAYMOND filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON CO. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6390

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

CONSTANTE, RAYMOND

CONSTANTE, SHIRLEY (WIFE)

ELLIOT COMPANY

CONSTANTE, MANUEL A (IND AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE HEIRS

A W CHESTERTON CO

DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY

FLOWSERVER CORPORATION

GARLOCK INC

UNIROYAL HOLDING CO

BEAZER EAST INC

BONDEX INTERNATIONAL

H H ROBERTSON COMPANY

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY

RPM INC

T H AGRICULTURE & NUTRITION LLC

OGLEBAY NORTON COMPANY

THIEM CORPORATION

AFTON PUMPS INC

GUARD-LINE INC

LAMONS METAL GASKET COMPANY INC

43 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

LANIER, W. MARK

ROACH, CRYSTAL

EDWARDS, BRADY SHERROD

MASTERS, SHELLY DIANE

FATHEREE, JASON WALKER

FARRELL, WILLIAM HOWARD

Other Attorneys

LABOON, JOHN ANDREW

LOWERY, JAMES A. III

FERRELL, MELISSA K.

FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM

FULLER, L. HAYES III

PRAZAK, JONATHAN R

SCOFIELD, DENISE URZENDOWSKI

DE LOS SANTOS, EDDY L. JR.

ALMQUIST, ARTHUR RAY

POWERS, JAMES H.

ADAMS, ROBERT L.

ELLISTON, GARY D.

VOLMERT, ELIZABETH PAINTER

HENSON, WALTER TOM

5 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2015
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • ANSWER THIRD AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - SKAGGS, JERAMY MITCHELL Person Filing - LAMONS GASKET COMPANY (INCORRECTLY SUED AS LAMONS METAL GASKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • ANSWER THIRD AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BOSIO, NATHANIEL AUSTIN Person Filing - GUARD-LINE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • THIRD AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PYLE, BENJAMIN STUART Person Filing - CONSTANTE, MANUEL A (IND AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • THIRD AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PYLE, BENJAMIN STUART Person Filing - CONSTANTE, RAYMOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • THIRD AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - PYLE, BENJAMIN STUART Person Filing - CONSTANTE, SHIRLEY (WIFE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162)

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2005
  • FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - BULLOCK, R. CRAIG Person Filing - CONSTANTE, RAYMOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ROACH, CRYSTAL Person Filing - ELLIOT COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ADAMS, ROBERT L. Person Filing - CRANE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM Person Filing - GENERAL ELECTRIC CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - POWERS, JAMES H. Person Filing - UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - POWERS, JAMES H. Person Filing - COOPER INDUSTRIES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - POWERS, JAMES H. Person Filing - CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - ALMQUIST, ARTHUR RAY Person Filing - DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LANIER, W. MARK Person Filing - CONSTANTE, RAYMOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - LANIER, W. MARK Person Filing - CONSTANTE, SHIRLEY (WIFE)

    Read MoreRead Less