This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/11/2021 at 07:44:15 (UTC).

CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY (SPIRIT ONE - ENERGY CENTER IV) vs. HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY SPIRIT ONE - ENERGY CENTER IV filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1421

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LATOSHA LEWIS PAYNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY (SPIRIT ONE - ENERGY CENTER IV)

Defendant

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT

Other

HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS

13013 Northwest Freeway

Houston, TX 77040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONOVAN, KATHLEEN FAYE

Defendant Attorney

OUSLANDER, COREY ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Citation (Executed)

08/26/2021: Citation (Executed)

Defendant's Original Answer

09/09/2021: Defendant's Original Answer

Request for Issuance of Service

08/18/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Plaintiffs Original Petition

08/18/2021: Plaintiffs Original Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: OUSLANDER, COREY ROBERT; Person Filing: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING ITS; Issued: 8/19/2021; Served: 8/23/2021; Tracking: 73903637; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DONOVAN, KATHLEEN FAYE; Person Filing: CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY (SPIRIT ONE - ENERGY CENTER IV);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY APPRAISAL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OUSLANDER, COREY ROBERT