This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 12/30/2021 at 07:24:30 (UTC).

COLEMAN, COURTNEY vs. SCOREMORE LLC

Case Summary

On 12/06/2021 COLEMAN, COURTNEY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SCOREMORE LLC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is BRITTANYE MORRIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9077

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

BRITTANYE MORRIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLEMAN, COURTNEY

Defendants

SCOREMORE LLC

SCOREMORE HOLDINGS LLC

SCOREMORE MGMT LLC

AEG FACILITIES LLC

ONEX CORPORATION

SMG HOLDINGS LLC

ASM GLOBAL LLC

ASM GLOBAL PARENT INC

EIGHTEENTWENTYSIX LLC

CACTUS JACK RECORDS LLC

WEBSTER, JACQUES (II) (AKA TRAVIS SCOTT)

Cypress, TX 77429

HARRIS COUNTY SPORTS & CONVENTION CORPORATION

NRG ENERGY INC

Others

SCOREMORE LLC (A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) MAY BE SERVED BY

5704 W Hwy 290

Austin, TX 78735

SCOREMORE HOLDINGS LLC (A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) MAY BE

5444 Westheimer #1000

Houston, TX 77056

SCOREMORE MGMT LLC (A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) MAY BE SERVED

5704 W Hwy 290

Austin, TX 78735

AEG FACILITIES LLC (A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DOING BUSINESS IN

2710 Gateway Oaks Drive Suite 150N

Sacramento, CA 95833

ONEX CORPORATION (A CANADIAN CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS IN TEXAS)

SMG HOLDINGS LLC (A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DOING BUSINESS IN

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AZIZ, MUHAMMAD SULEIMAN

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Notice of Partial Nonsuit Without Prejudice

12/09/2021: Plaintiff's Notice of Partial Nonsuit Without Prejudice

Proposed Order

12/09/2021: Proposed Order

Plaintiff's Original Petition

12/06/2021: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Request for Issuance of Service

12/06/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED

12/13/2021: ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED; Order Signed: 12/13/2021;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: WEBSTER, JACQUES (II) (AKA TRAVIS SCOTT); Issued: 12/7/2021; Tracking: 73948533; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: NRG ENERGY INC (A FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS IN TEXAS); Issued: 12/7/2021; Tracking: 73948529; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: HARRIS COUNTY SPORTS & CONVENTION CORPORATION (A FOR-PROFIT; Issued: 12/7/2021; Tracking: 73948527; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: CACTUS JACK RECORDS LLC (A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DOING; Issued: 12/7/2021; Tracking: 73948526; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: EIGHTEENTWENTYSIX LLC (A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DOING BUSINESS IN; Issued: 12/7/2021; Tracking: 73948524; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ASM GLOBAL PARENT INC (A FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS IN; Issued: 12/7/2021; Tracking: 73948523; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ASM GLOBAL LLC (A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DOING BUSINESS IN TEXAS); Issued: 12/7/2021; Tracking: 73948522; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SMG HOLDINGS LLC (A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DOING BUSINESS IN; Issued: 12/7/2021; Tracking: 73948521; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (NON-RESIDENT CORPORATE); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ONEX CORPORATION (A CANADIAN CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS IN TEXAS); Issued: 12/7/2021; Tracking: 73948519; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION(NON-RESIDENT); Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: AEG FACILITIES LLC (A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DOING BUSINESS IN; Issued: 12/7/2021; Tracking: 73948518; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SCOREMORE MGMT LLC (A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) MAY BE SERVED; Issued: 12/7/2021; Tracking: 73948486; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SCOREMORE HOLDINGS LLC (A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) MAY BE; Issued: 12/7/2021; Tracking: 73948482; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SCOREMORE LLC (A TEXAS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) MAY BE SERVED BY; Issued: 12/7/2021; Tracking: 73948477; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: AZIZ, MUHAMMAD SULEIMAN; Person Filing: COLEMAN, COURTNEY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less