This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 12/26/2016 at 09:36:01 (UTC).

COHEN, TINA vs. BY THE SEA COUNCIL OF C0-OWNERS INC

Case Summary

On 03/23/2016 COHEN, TINA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BY THE SEA COUNCIL OF C0-OWNERS INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ALEXANDRA SMOOTS-HOGAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8577

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ALEXANDRA SMOOTS-HOGAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COHEN, TINA

Defendants

COLLIER, IRENE

COLLIER, WILLIAM JOHN

BY THE SEA COUNCIL OF C0-OWNERS INC

Others

BY THE SEA COUNCIL OF CO-OWNERS INC MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING

COLLIER, IRENE MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING CHRIS C KING ATTORNEY OF

COLLIER, WILLIAM JOHN MAY BE SERVED BY SERVING CHRIS C KING ATTORNEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEENA, DANNY M.

Defendant Attorneys

KING, CHRISTOPHER CLAUDE

GLASS, MARGARET VIRGINIA

 

Court Documents

Civil Process Request

03/23/2016: Civil Process Request

Civil Process Request

03/23/2016: Civil Process Request

Civil Case Information sheet

03/23/2016: Civil Case Information sheet

Plaintiffs Original Petition and Request for Disclosures

03/23/2016: Plaintiffs Original Petition and Request for Disclosures

DEFENDANTS IRENE AND WILLIAM JOHN COLLIERS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND ORIGINAL ANSWER

04/06/2016: DEFENDANTS IRENE AND WILLIAM JOHN COLLIERS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND ORIGINAL ANSWER

Defendant by The Sea Council of Co-Owners Inc's Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition

04/15/2016: Defendant by The Sea Council of Co-Owners Inc's Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition

Proposed Order

04/19/2016: Proposed Order

Notice of defendant by the sea council of co-owners, Inc.s motion to transfer

04/19/2016: Notice of defendant by the sea council of co-owners, Inc.s motion to transfer

Exhibit B

04/15/2016: Exhibit B

Exhibit A

04/15/2016: Exhibit A

Exhibit

04/15/2016: Exhibit

Defendant By the Sea Council of Co-Owners, Inc's Motion to Transfer

04/15/2016: Defendant By the Sea Council of Co-Owners, Inc's Motion to Transfer

Proposed Order Setting Hearing

04/19/2016: Proposed Order Setting Hearing

Request for Hearing

04/19/2016: Request for Hearing

PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURES

04/20/2016: PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURES

Proposed Order

06/27/2016: Proposed Order

Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit with Prejudice

06/27/2016: Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit with Prejudice

ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED

07/12/2016: ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2016
  • Description: ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED; Order Signed: 7/12/2016;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • Description: EACH PAY OWN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • Description: FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SHEENA, DANNY M.; Person Filing: COHEN, TINA;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: GLASS, MARGARET VIRGINIA; Person Filing: BY THE SEA COUNCIL OF C0-OWNERS INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • Description: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: KING, CHRISTOPHER CLAUDE; Person Filing: COLLIER, WILLIAM JOHN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • Description: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: KING, CHRISTOPHER CLAUDE; Person Filing: COLLIER, IRENE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SHEENA, DANNY M.; Person Filing: COHEN, TINA;

    Read MoreRead Less