This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 01/27/2019 at 07:17:05 (UTC).

COCHRAN, DAVID vs. AVON PRODUCTS INC

Case Summary

On 01/03/2019 COCHRAN, DAVID filed an Other lawsuit against AVON PRODUCTS INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0401

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COCHRAN, DAVID

Lindale, TX 53807

Defendants and Others

IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201-3140

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC

AVON PRODUCTS INC

KCG INC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO RUCO INC)

211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701-3218

FLOWSERVE US INC (SUED AS SUCCESSOR TO EDWARD VALVE INC)

CHARLES B CHRYSTAL COMPANY INC

2 Madison Avenue Suite 211

Larchmont, NY 10538

MURCO WALL PRODUCTS INC

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

One Johnson & Johnson Plaza

New Brunswick, NJ 08933

JONES-BLAIR COMPANY LLC

LUZENAC AMERICA INC

CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COMPANY (SUED INDIVIDUALLY DOING BUSINESS AS AND

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

JOHNSON & JOHNSON (CORPORATION) BY SERVING THE TEXAS SECRETARY OF

One Johnson & Johnson Plaza

New Brunswick, NJ 08933

JONES-BLAIR COMPANY LLC BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT CAPITAL

206 E 9Th Street Suite 1300

Austin, TX 78701-4411

FLOWSERVE US INC (SUED AS SUCCESSOR TO EDWARD VALVE INC) BY SERVING

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201-3140

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (A SUBSIDIARY OF JOHNSON & JOHNSON)

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201-3140

MURCO WALL PRODUCTS INC BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT

201 Ne 21St

Fort Worth, TX 76106

CHARLES B CHRYSTAL COMPANY INC BY SERVING THE SECRETARY OF STATE

2 Madison Avenue Suite 211

Larchmont, NY 10538

AVON PRODUCTS INC BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT CT CORPORATION

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201-3140

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVIS, HEATHER VENRICK

Defendant Attorneys

DAVIS, SARAH MARIE

STEINMANN, CORI MICHELLE CUDABA

MILTENBERGER, LEWIS C.

LAWSON, RODNEY HALL

BARRON, BARBARA JANE

DEANS, GREGORY LEE

TERRY, MICHAEL G.

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Original Petition and Jury Demand

01/03/2019: Plaintiff's Original Petition and Jury Demand

Plaintiffs Notice of Transfer Under Rule 13 Of Tag-Along Case

01/03/2019: Plaintiffs Notice of Transfer Under Rule 13 Of Tag-Along Case

EXHIBIT A

01/03/2019: EXHIBIT A

EXHIBIT B

01/03/2019: EXHIBIT B

Plaitiffs' Notice of Intent to take the Oral Videotaped Deposition of David Cochran

01/03/2019: Plaitiffs' Notice of Intent to take the Oral Videotaped Deposition of David Cochran

Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition and Jury Demand

01/25/2019: Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition and Jury Demand

Defendant KCG Inc's Original Answer, Special Exceptions and Answer to Cross Actions

01/24/2019: Defendant KCG Inc's Original Answer, Special Exceptions and Answer to Cross Actions

Defendant's Motion To Transfer Venue and Subject Thereto, Original Answer To Plaintiffs Original Petition and Answer To all Cross Action

01/23/2019: Defendant's Motion To Transfer Venue and Subject Thereto, Original Answer To Plaintiffs Original Petition and Answer To all Cross Action

Letter to Clerk

01/23/2019: Letter to Clerk

Defendant Johnson & Johnson's Answer and Defenses To Plaintiff's Original Petition and Jury Demand

01/22/2019: Defendant Johnson & Johnson's Answer and Defenses To Plaintiff's Original Petition and Jury Demand

Defendant Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Answer and Defenses To Plaintiff's Original Petition and Jury Demand

01/22/2019: Defendant Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Answer and Defenses To Plaintiff's Original Petition and Jury Demand

Defendant Imerys Talc America Inc's (sued individually and incorrectly as successor in interest to Luzenac America Inc successor in interest to Cyprus Industrial Minerals Company and Windsor Minerals Inc and Metropolitan Talc Co) original answer to p

01/18/2019: Defendant Imerys Talc America Inc's (sued individually and incorrectly as successor in interest to Luzenac America Inc successor in interest to Cyprus Industrial Minerals Company and Windsor Minerals Inc and Metropolitan Talc Co) original answer to plain

Defendant Murco Wall Products Inc's motion to transfer venue and subject thereto original answer

01/18/2019: Defendant Murco Wall Products Inc's motion to transfer venue and subject thereto original answer

Exhibit A

01/18/2019: Exhibit A

Proposed Order granting defendant Murco Wall Products Inc's motion to transfer venue to Tarrant Countu

01/18/2019: Proposed Order granting defendant Murco Wall Products Inc's motion to transfer venue to Tarrant Countu

Defendant's Answer tp Plaintiff's Original Petition and Jury Demand

01/18/2019: Defendant's Answer tp Plaintiff's Original Petition and Jury Demand

Original Answer of Defendant Flowserve US, Inc., Solely as Successor to Edward Valves, Inc.

01/11/2019: Original Answer of Defendant Flowserve US, Inc., Solely as Successor to Edward Valves, Inc.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2019
  • Description: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: TERRY, MICHAEL G.; Person Filing: JOHNSON & JOHNSON;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Description: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MILTENBERGER, LEWIS C.; Person Filing: KCG INC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO RUCO INC);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BARRON, BARBARA JANE; Person Filing: CHARLES B CHRYSTAL COMPANY INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Description: ANSWER CROSS ACTION; Filing Attorney: BARRON, BARBARA JANE; Person Filing: CHARLES B CHRYSTAL COMPANY INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: TERRY, MICHAEL G.; Person Filing: JOHNSON & JOHNSON;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: STEINMANN, CORI MICHELLE CUDABA; Person Filing: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Description: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DEANS, GREGORY LEE; Person Filing: MURCO WALL PRODUCTS INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Description: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: TERRY, MICHAEL G.; Person Filing: JOHNSON & JOHNSON;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DAVIS, SARAH MARIE; Person Filing: IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Description: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: LAWSON, RODNEY HALL; Person Filing: FLOWSERVE US INC (SUED AS SUCCESSOR TO EDWARD VALVE INC);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Description: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DAVIS, HEATHER VENRICK; Person Filing: COCHRAN, DAVID;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AVON PRODUCTS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where KCG, INC. DBA REW MATERIALS SUED AS REW MATERIALS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MURCO WALL PRODUCTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CHARLES B. CHRYSTAL COMPANY, INC. is a litigant