This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/31/2022 at 07:18:00 (UTC).

CLIFT, LORIE vs. AVON PRODUCTS INC

Case Summary

On 07/07/2022 CLIFT, LORIE filed an Other lawsuit against AVON PRODUCTS INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0586

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CLIFT, LORIE

MCCOY, LESLIE

FUTCH, CHRISTOPHER

Defendants

AVON PRODUCTS INC

BARRETTS MINERALS INC

BAYER CONSUMER CAR HOLDINGS LLC (F/K/A BAYER CONSUMER CARE

BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC A SUBSIDIARY OF BAYER AG FOR ITS

BAYER SAMSON II LLC (A/K/A AND D/B/A DR SCHOLL'S LLC)

BEACON CMP CORPORATION

BLOCK DRUG COMPANY INC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST

BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA INC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-

BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES LLC (F/K/A BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES INC F/K/A

BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS

CHARLES B CHRYSTAL COMPANY INC

CHATTEM INC A SUBSIDIARY OF SANOFI-AVENTIS U S LLC (SUED

CLINIQUE LABORATORIES LLC ( F/K/A CLINIQUE LABORATORIES INC)

COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY (SUED INDIVIDAULLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-

COLOR TECHNIQUES INC

COSMETIC SPECIALTIES INC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND FORMERLY (D/B/A

COTY INC (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND FOR ITS SUBSIDIARY NOXELL CORPORATION

39 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETERSON, HOLLY CHRISTINE

Defendant Attorneys

SPARDONE, STEPHANIE L.

FRAZIER, MARY ELIZONDO

ELLIS, G. JOE

SIMEK, DOUGLAS RICHARD

ELLISTON, GARY D.

DANIEL, AUSTIN COLYER

Other Attorneys

WILKES, FORREST REN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Transfer Under Rule 13 of Tag Along Case

07/07/2022: Notice of Transfer Under Rule 13 of Tag Along Case

EXHIBIT A

07/07/2022: EXHIBIT A

EXHIBIT B

07/07/2022: EXHIBIT B

Scholl's Wellness Company Special Appearance

07/15/2022: Scholl's Wellness Company Special Appearance

Exhibit A

07/15/2022: Exhibit A

Exhibit B

07/15/2022: Exhibit B

Exhibit C

07/15/2022: Exhibit C

AVON PRODUCTS, INC.S SPECIAL APPEARANCE AND SUBJECT THERETO, ORIGINAL ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION AND JURY DEMAND, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWER TO ALL CROSS CLAIMS

07/15/2022: AVON PRODUCTS, INC.S SPECIAL APPEARANCE AND SUBJECT THERETO, ORIGINAL ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION AND JURY DEMAND, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWER TO ALL CROSS CLAIMS

DEFENDANT, MERCK & CO., INC.S, ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND

07/14/2022: DEFENDANT, MERCK & CO., INC.S, ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND

Defendants Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC, Bayer Healthcare LLC, and Bayer Samson II LLC Motion to Transfer Venue and Original Answer

07/18/2022: Defendants Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC, Bayer Healthcare LLC, and Bayer Samson II LLC Motion to Transfer Venue and Original Answer

Defendant Pfizer Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue and, Subject Thereto, Original Answer, Special Exceptions, Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand to Plaintiffs' Original Petition and requests for Disclosure to Plaintiffs

07/18/2022: Defendant Pfizer Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue and, Subject Thereto, Original Answer, Special Exceptions, Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand to Plaintiffs' Original Petition and requests for Disclosure to Plaintiffs

Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Barretts Minerals Inc.

07/18/2022: Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Barretts Minerals Inc.

Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Specialty Minerals Inc.

07/18/2022: Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Specialty Minerals Inc.

Defendant Chattem, Inc.'s Verified Original Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Petition, Cross-Claims and Answer to All Cross Claims

07/18/2022: Defendant Chattem, Inc.'s Verified Original Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Petition, Cross-Claims and Answer to All Cross Claims

Defendant Colgate-Palmolive Company's Special Appearance, Motion to Transfer Venue, Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens, Special Exceptions, Original Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition, Affirmative Defenses, and Answer to all Cross-C

07/15/2022: Defendant Colgate-Palmolive Company's Special Appearance, Motion to Transfer Venue, Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens, Special Exceptions, Original Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition, Affirmative Defenses, and Answer to all Cross-Claim

Defendant Bristol-Myers Squibb Company's Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Petition

07/15/2022: Defendant Bristol-Myers Squibb Company's Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Petition

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: FRAZIER, MARY ELIZONDO; Person Filing: SPECIALTY MINERALS INC ( SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUBSIDIARY OF;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: FRAZIER, MARY ELIZONDO; Person Filing: BARRETTS MINERALS INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: ELLIS, G. JOE; Person Filing: BAYER SAMSON II LLC (A/K/A AND D/B/A DR SCHOLL'S LLC);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: ELLIS, G. JOE; Person Filing: BAYER SAMSON II LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: ELLIS, G. JOE; Person Filing: BAYER CONSUMER CARE LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: ELLIS, G. JOE; Person Filing: DR SCHOLL'S LLC (A/K/A BAYER SAMSON II LLC);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: ELLIS, G. JOE; Person Filing: BAYER CONSUMER CAR HOLDINGS LLC (F/K/A BAYER CONSUMER CARE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: FRAZIER, MARY ELIZONDO; Person Filing: PFIZER INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: ELLISTON, GARY D.; Person Filing: CHATTEM INC A SUBSIDIARY OF SANOFI-AVENTIS U S LLC (SUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: ELLIS, G. JOE; Person Filing: BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC A SUBSIDIARY OF BAYER AG FOR ITS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: SIMEK, DOUGLAS RICHARD; Person Filing: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SPARDONE, STEPHANIE L.; Person Filing: AVON PRODUCTS INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: DANIEL, AUSTIN COLYER; Person Filing: COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY (SUED INDIVIDAULLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WILKES, FORREST REN; Person Filing: MERCK & CO., INC.,;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PETERSON, HOLLY CHRISTINE; Person Filing: FUTCH, CHRISTOPHER;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PETERSON, HOLLY CHRISTINE; Person Filing: CLIFT, LORIE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PETERSON, HOLLY CHRISTINE; Person Filing: MCCOY, LESLIE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: REFERRED TO PRE-TRIAL COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DR. SCHOLL'S LLC a/k/a BAYER SAMSON II LLC; is a litigant

Latest cases where Beacon CMP Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where CLINIQUE LABORATORIES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AVON PRODUCTS, INC. is a litigant