This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 09/15/2021 at 07:14:56 (UTC).

CLEVENGER, DORIS vs. AMERICAN CLUTCH & EQUIPMENT COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/06/2021 CLEVENGER, DORIS filed an Other lawsuit against AMERICAN CLUTCH EQUIPMENT COMPANY. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are BEAU MILLER, BRITTANYE MORRIS and KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7215

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

BEAU MILLER

BRITTANYE MORRIS

KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CLEVENGER, DORIS

CLEVENGER, STEVEN

WHITE, AMY

Defendants and Cross Defendants

AMERICAN CLUTCH & EQUIPMENT COMPANY

A O SMITH CORPORATION

ARROYO DRILLING COMPANY (A/KA ARROYO EXPLORATION AND DRILLING INC)

A W CHESTERTON CO

AVANTOR INC (AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BAKER CHEMICAL)

BAKER CHEMICAL INC

BAKER HUGHES OILFIELD OPERATIONS INC

BAROID DRILLING FLUIDS INC

BEAZER EAST INC

BIRD CORP

BW/IP INC

CAMERON INTERNATIONAL COMPANY (A/K/A COOPER CAMERON CORPORATION)

208 South Lasalle Street Suite 814

Chicago, IL 60604

CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORP (AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO COOPER-

CHEVRON PHILLIPS CHEMICAL COMPANY LLC (D/B/A CP CHEMICAL COMPANY LLC

CHEVRON PHILLIPS CHEMICAL COMPANY LP (AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

CHEVRON PHILLIPS CHEMICAL HOLDINGS II LLC (AS SUCCESSOR IN

CHEVRON USA INC (F/K/A STANDARD OIL COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA U S)

WHITE, AMY

Others, Defendants and Cross Defendants

CAMERON INTERNATIONAL COMPANY (A/K/A COOPER CAMERON CORPORATION)

208 South Lasalle Street Suite 814

Chicago, IL 60604

CHEVRON PHILLIPS CHEMICAL COMPANY LP (AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

155 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SYMPHORIEN-RESTREPO, LEYDYLUZ

10940 W Sam Hous

Houston, TX 77064

Defendant Attorneys

HARRISON, JOSHUA M.

ATWELL, STUART C.

CLARY, BRIAN S.

STUDEBAKER, JENNIFER MARIE

DERDEN, ALBERT CHRISTOPHER

LEDYARD, DAVID W.

Other Attorneys

WARE, JAMES L.

STAINE, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL

ELLISTON, GARY D.

EDWARDS, BRADY SHERROD

AVILES, ARTURO M.

FOLEY, KEITH WILLIAM

RAHMAN, LAURA SPADAFORA

BOND, BEVERLY MICHELLE

ANDARSIO, PETE

HORNE, NATHAN RAY

BARRON, BARBARA JANE

LAWSON, RODNEY HALL

PEVSNER, JOSEPH STUART

9 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Defendant Grinnell LLC'S Original Answer To Plaintiffs' Original Petition and Jury Demand

07/19/2021: Defendant Grinnell LLC'S Original Answer To Plaintiffs' Original Petition and Jury Demand

Clevenger-2021-07-15 HCDC CPR Crane

07/15/2021: Clevenger-2021-07-15 HCDC CPR Crane

Jury Demand

06/18/2021: Jury Demand

Defendant Avantor INC.'S (Individually and as Successor in interest to Baker Chemical) Motion To Transfer Venue and Subject Thereto, Original Answer To All Cross Claims

06/11/2021: Defendant Avantor INC.'S (Individually and as Successor in interest to Baker Chemical) Motion To Transfer Venue and Subject Thereto, Original Answer To All Cross Claims

Clevenger - DMC - Jury Demand

06/11/2021: Clevenger - DMC - Jury Demand

General Electric Company's Special Exceptions, and Subject Thereto, Original Answer and Answer To All Cross Actions

06/16/2021: General Electric Company's Special Exceptions, and Subject Thereto, Original Answer and Answer To All Cross Actions

Request for Issuance of Service Rockwell

05/11/2021: Request for Issuance of Service Rockwell

Request for Issuance of Service MAP

05/11/2021: Request for Issuance of Service MAP

Request for Issuance of Service ITTC 2

05/11/2021: Request for Issuance of Service ITTC 2

Request for Issuance of Service GTC

05/11/2021: Request for Issuance of Service GTC

Request for Issuance of Service GPI

05/11/2021: Request for Issuance of Service GPI

Request for Issuance of Service GDI

05/11/2021: Request for Issuance of Service GDI

Request for Issuance of Service BWIP

05/11/2021: Request for Issuance of Service BWIP

Request for Issuance of Service Avantor

05/11/2021: Request for Issuance of Service Avantor

Request for Issuance of Service ACE

05/11/2021: Request for Issuance of Service ACE

Affidavit of Service - Lewis Manufacturing - POS

05/17/2021: Affidavit of Service - Lewis Manufacturing - POS

Citation

05/17/2021: Citation

Citation - Western Auto Supply Company

05/20/2021: Citation - Western Auto Supply Company

214 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: FULTZ, JEFFREY PIERCE; Person Filing: STANDCO INDUSTRIES;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: NONSUIT/DISMISSAL, PARTIAL (RULE 162); Order Signed: 8/24/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: THOMPSON, JAMES MICHAEL; Person Filing: PARKER HANNIFIN (AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO ZENITH PUMPS COMPANY) MAY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SCUDDER, MARK S.; Person Filing: NIBCO INC.;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DERDEN, ALBERT CHRISTOPHER; Person Filing: CHEVRON PHILLIPS CHEMICAL COMPANY LLC (D/B/A CP CHEMICAL COMPANY LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: DERDEN, ALBERT CHRISTOPHER; Person Filing: CHEVRON PHILLIPS CHEMICAL HOLDINGS II LLC (AS SUCCESSOR IN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PUJOL, PATRICE; Person Filing: BAKER HUGHES OILFIELD OPERATIONS LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER; Filing Attorney: VARSHOSAZ, ARTOUSH; Person Filing: CRANE COMPANY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: EDWARDS, BRADY SHERROD; Person Filing: GRINNELL LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
119 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: PARKER DRILLING CO; Issued: 5/11/2021; Received: 6/3/2021; Tracking: 73869660; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: NATIONAL OILWELL VARCO; Issued: 5/11/2021; Served: 5/14/2021; Tracking: 73869657; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SYMPHORIEN-RESTREPO, LEYDYLUZ; Person Filing: CLEVENGER, STEVEN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SYMPHORIEN-RESTREPO, LEYDYLUZ; Person Filing: CLEVENGER, DORIS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SYMPHORIEN-RESTREPO, LEYDYLUZ; Person Filing: WHITE, AMY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHEVRON PHILLIPS CHEMICAL HOLDINGS II LLC (AS SUCCESSOR IN is a litigant

Latest cases where BAROID DRILLING FLUIDS INC is a litigant