Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 05/01/2021 at 07:44:52 (UTC).

CLEAR LAKE CITY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC vs. ENGLISH, JUSTIN ALAN

Case Summary

On 04/07/2021 CLEAR LAKE CITY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC filed an Other lawsuit against ENGLISH, JUSTIN ALAN. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DAWN ROGERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0497

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DAWN ROGERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLEAR LAKE CITY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

Defendant

ENGLISH, JUSTIN ALAN

Houston, TX 77062

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MADDOX, MARGARET ROSE

 

Court Documents

Return of Service: JUSTIN ALAN ENGLISH

04/15/2021: Return of Service: JUSTIN ALAN ENGLISH

Request for Issuance of Service

04/07/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

EXHIBIT D

04/07/2021: EXHIBIT D

EXHIBIT C

04/07/2021: EXHIBIT C

EXHIBIT B

04/07/2021: EXHIBIT B

EXHIBIT A

04/07/2021: EXHIBIT A

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

04/07/2021: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION; Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ENGLISH, JUSTIN ALAN; Issued: 4/8/2021; Served: 4/14/2021; Tracking: 73858345; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MADDOX, MARGARET ROSE; Person Filing: CLEAR LAKE CITY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLEAR LAKE CITY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MADDOX, MARGARET ROSE