This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 03/02/2021 at 14:21:55 (UTC).

CLAYTON, FRANCES vs. TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLC (D/B/A TIMEWISE SHELL AND D/B/A TIMEWISE

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 CLAYTON, FRANCES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLC D/B/A TIMEWISE SHELL AND D/B/A TIMEWISE. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is TANYA GARRISON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2205

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

TANYA GARRISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLAYTON, FRANCES

Defendants and Others

TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLC (D/B/A TIMEWISE SHELL AND D/B/A TIMEWISE

11111 Wilcrest Green Suite 100

Houston, TX 77042

TIMEWISE FOOD STORES #208

LANDMARK INDUSTRIES DEVELOPMENT LLC (D/B/A TIMEWISE SHELL AND D/B/A

11111 Wilcrest Green Suite 100

Houston, TX 77042

LANDMARK INDUSTRIES HOLDINGS LTD (D/B/A TIMEWISE SHELL AND D/B/A

11111 Wilcrest Green Suite 100

Houston, TX 77042

LANDMARK INDUSTRIES ENERGY LLC (D/B/A TIMEWISE SHELL AND D/B/A

11111 Wilcrest Green Suite 100

Houston, TX 77042

LANDMARK INDUSTRIES LLC (D/B/A TIMEWISE SHELL AND D/B/A TIMEWISE FOOD

11111 Wilcrest Green Suite 100

Houston, TX 77042

TIMEWISE SHELL

TIMEWISE FOOD STORES

TIMEWISE FOOD STORES (D/B/A TIMEWISE FOOD STORES #208)

TIMEWISE SHELL (A CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS

Houston, TX 77042

TIMEWISE FOOD STORES (D/B/A TIMEWISE FOOD STORES #208) (A CORPORATION)

11111 Wilcrest Green Suite 100

Houston, TX 77042

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MESTEMAKER, DAVID KENT

Defendant Attorney

ZITO, NICHOLAS E.

 

Court Documents

Plaintiffs Original Petition

01/14/2021: Plaintiffs Original Petition

Request for Issuance of Service

01/14/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

01/14/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

01/14/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

01/14/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

01/14/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

01/14/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

Request for Issuance of Service

01/14/2021: Request for Issuance of Service

DEFENDANTS TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLC AND LANDMARK INDUSTRIES LLC DBA TIMEWISE FOOD STORES ORIGINAL ANSWER

02/12/2021: DEFENDANTS TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLC AND LANDMARK INDUSTRIES LLC DBA TIMEWISE FOOD STORES ORIGINAL ANSWER

DEFENDANTS TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLC AND LANDMARK INDUSTRIES LLC DBA TIMEWISE FOOD STORES JURY DEMAND

02/12/2021: DEFENDANTS TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLC AND LANDMARK INDUSTRIES LLC DBA TIMEWISE FOOD STORES JURY DEMAND

Notice of Filing of Rule 11 Agreement

02/08/2021: Notice of Filing of Rule 11 Agreement

Exhibit A

02/08/2021: Exhibit A

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ZITO, NICHOLAS E.; Person Filing: TIMEWISE SHELL;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ZITO, NICHOLAS E.; Person Filing: LANDMARK INDUSTRIES DEVELOPMENT LLC (D/B/A TIMEWISE SHELL AND D/B/A;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ZITO, NICHOLAS E.; Person Filing: TIMEWISE FOOD STORES (D/B/A TIMEWISE FOOD STORES #208);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ZITO, NICHOLAS E.; Person Filing: TIMEWISE FOOD STORES;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ZITO, NICHOLAS E.; Person Filing: TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLC (D/B/A TIMEWISE SHELL AND D/B/A TIMEWISE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ZITO, NICHOLAS E.; Person Filing: TIMEWISE FOOD STORES #208;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ZITO, NICHOLAS E.; Person Filing: LANDMARK INDUSTRIES LLC (D/B/A TIMEWISE SHELL AND D/B/A TIMEWISE FOOD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ZITO, NICHOLAS E.; Person Filing: LANDMARK INDUSTRIES ENERGY LLC (D/B/A TIMEWISE SHELL AND D/B/A;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: ZITO, NICHOLAS E.; Person Filing: LANDMARK INDUSTRIES HOLDINGS LTD (D/B/A TIMEWISE SHELL AND D/B/A;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TIMEWISE FOOD STORES (D/B/A TIMEWISE FOOD STORES #208) (A CORPORATION); Issued: 1/15/2021; Tracking: 73831236; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TIMEWISE SHELL (A CORPORATION) MAY BE SERVED THROUGH ITS; Issued: 1/15/2021; Tracking: 73831232; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LANDMARK INDUSTRIES DEVELOPMENT LLC (D/B/A TIMEWISE SHELL AND D/B/A; Issued: 1/15/2021; Tracking: 73831227; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LANDMARK INDUSTRIES ENERGY LLC (D/B/A TIMEWISE SHELL AND D/B/A; Issued: 1/15/2021; Tracking: 73831225; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LANDMARK INDUSTRIES HOLDINGS LTD (D/B/A TIMEWISE SHELL AND D/B/A; Issued: 1/15/2021; Tracking: 73831221; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: LANDMARK INDUSTRIES LLC (D/B/A TIMEWISE SHELL AND D/B/A TIMEWISE FOOD; Issued: 1/15/2021; Tracking: 73831220; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION CORPORATE; Status: SERVICE ISSUED/IN POSSESSION OF SERVING AGENCY; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLC (D/B/A TIMEWISE SHELL AND D/B/A TIMEWISE; Issued: 1/15/2021; Tracking: 73831219; Deliver To: E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MESTEMAKER, DAVID KENT; Person Filing: CLAYTON, FRANCES;

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LANDMARK INDUSTRIES LLC (D/B/A TIMEWISE SHELL AND D/B/A TIMEWISE FOOD is a litigant

Latest cases where TIMEWISE FOOD STORES #208 is a litigant

Latest cases where LANDMARK INDUSTRIES ENERGY LLC (D/B/A TIMEWISE SHELL AND D/B/A is a litigant

Latest cases where TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLC is a litigant