This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/30/2020 at 07:58:24 (UTC).

CITY OF LEON VALLEY vs. ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC

Case Summary

On 07/06/2020 CITY OF LEON VALLEY filed an Other lawsuit against ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT K. SCHAFFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9837

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT K. SCHAFFER

 

Party Details

Defendants

MCKESSON CORPORATION

MYLAN INSTITUTIONAL INC

MYLAN INC

MALLINCKRODT LLC

MALLINCKRODT PLC

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

ABBVIE INC

MISSION PHARMACAL COMPANY

CEPHALON INC

MYLAN SPECIALTY L P

ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC

ACTAVIS LLC

ALLERGAN PLC (F/K/A ACTAVIS PLC)

MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC

TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC

TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD

MCKESSON MEDICAL-SURGICAL INC

MYLAN BERTEK PHARMACEUTICALS INC

ACTAVIS PHARMA INC (F/K/A WATSON PHARMA INC)

ALLERGAN FINANCE LLC (F/K/A ACTAVIS INC F/K/A WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS INC

19 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

SMYSER, CRAIG

BOYCE, MARIA WYCKOFF

MCCLEARY, ROGER L.

MCCONNICO, STEPHEN E.

PATTERSON, NANCY L.

Other Attorneys

WILKES, JOHN LAURENS

SIBISKI, HANNAH DEMARCO

MENGIS, MICHAEL W.

SADLER, KEVIN MARSHALL

PERRY, CHARLES STANTON

DURFEE, MATTHEW ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Defendants Cardinal Health, INC. and Cardinal Health 110, LLC's Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses to City of Leon Valley's Original Petition and Requests for Disclosure

07/10/2020: Defendants Cardinal Health, INC. and Cardinal Health 110, LLC's Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses to City of Leon Valley's Original Petition and Requests for Disclosure

Defendant Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc's Original Answer And Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Pettion

07/13/2020: Defendant Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc's Original Answer And Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Pettion

Defendant Jassen Pharmaceuticals, INC and Johnson & Johnson's Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition

07/13/2020: Defendant Jassen Pharmaceuticals, INC and Johnson & Johnson's Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition

Amerisourcebergen Corporation and Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation's Original Answer

07/14/2020: Amerisourcebergen Corporation and Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation's Original Answer

Noramco, Inc's Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses

07/17/2020: Noramco, Inc's Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses

The Mylan Defendants' Original Answer and Reuqest for Disclosure

07/17/2020: The Mylan Defendants' Original Answer and Reuqest for Disclosure

Exhibit 1 - Affidavit

07/24/2020: Exhibit 1 - Affidavit

Defendant Mallinckrodt PLC's Special Appearance

07/24/2020: Defendant Mallinckrodt PLC's Special Appearance

Defendant Specgx LLC's Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition

07/24/2020: Defendant Specgx LLC's Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition

Appendix F-Order appointing Judge Schaffer

07/06/2020: Appendix F-Order appointing Judge Schaffer

Appendix E-Order of voluntary recusal

07/06/2020: Appendix E-Order of voluntary recusal

Appendix D-Order appointing Judge Peeples

07/06/2020: Appendix D-Order appointing Judge Peeples

Appendix C-Order granting motions to transfer

07/06/2020: Appendix C-Order granting motions to transfer

Appendix A-List of parties who have appeared and remain in the case

07/06/2020: Appendix A-List of parties who have appeared and remain in the case

City of Leon Valley - Appendix G

07/07/2020: City of Leon Valley - Appendix G

City of Leon Valley - Appendix F

07/07/2020: City of Leon Valley - Appendix F

City of Leon Valley - Appendix C

07/07/2020: City of Leon Valley - Appendix C

Knoll Pharmaceautical Company and Abvie INC's Answer and Affirmative and Other Defenses

07/10/2020: Knoll Pharmaceautical Company and Abvie INC's Answer and Affirmative and Other Defenses

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCCLEARY, ROGER L.; Person Filing: SPECGX LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SIBISKI, HANNAH DEMARCO; Person Filing: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SIBISKI, HANNAH DEMARCO; Person Filing: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SIBISKI, HANNAH DEMARCO; Person Filing: ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BOYCE, MARIA WYCKOFF; Person Filing: MYLAN SPECIALTY L P;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: BOYCE, MARIA WYCKOFF; Person Filing: MYLAN BERTEK PHARMACEUTICALS INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SMYSER, CRAIG; Person Filing: MCKESSON MEDICAL-SURGICAL INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: PATTERSON, NANCY L.; Person Filing: ACTAVIS LABORATORIES UT INC (F/K/A WATSON LABORATORIES INC);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCCONNICO, STEPHEN E.; Person Filing: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC (F/K/A ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCCONNICO, STEPHEN E.; Person Filing: JOHNSON & JOHNSON;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MCCONNICO, STEPHEN E.; Person Filing: ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC (N/K/A JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MENGIS, MICHAEL W.; Person Filing: CARDINAL HEALTH 110 LLC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: MENGIS, MICHAEL W.; Person Filing: CARDINAL HEALTH INC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: WILKES, JOHN LAURENS; Person Filing: KNOLL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SIBISKI, HANNAH DEMARCO; Person Filing: CITY OF LEON VALLEY;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: SIBISKI, HANNAH DEMARCO; Person Filing: CITY OF LEON VALLEY;

    Read MoreRead Less