This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 07/06/2015 at 00:11:27 (UTC).

CITY OF GALENA PARK TEXAS vs. ORTIZ, JUAN MACIAS

Case Summary

On 01/05/2005 CITY OF GALENA PARK TEXAS filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against ORTIZ, JUAN MACIAS. This case was filed in Harris County District Courts, Harris County District Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0453

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Court:

    Harris County District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County District Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

CITY OF GALENA PARK TEXAS

GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT OF HARRIS COUNTY TEXAS

SAN JACINTO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

ORTIZ, JUAN MACIAS

ORTIZ, MINERVA

STATE OF TEXAS

HARRIS COUNTY TEXAS

PORT OF HOUSTON OF HARRIS COUNTY AUTHORITY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY EDUCATION DEPARTMENT

HORIZON CAPITAL BANK (LIENHOLDER)

CONN CREDIT CORPORATION (IN REM ONLY)

BANK OF AMERICA N A (IN REM ONLY)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOYNER, DEXTER

SNOOKS, DANIEL JOSEPH

Defendant Attorney

MARGOLIN, RICHARD F.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2005
  • DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2005
  • NO COSTS ALLOCATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2005
  • INTERVENTION : Filing Attorney - SNOOKS, DANIEL JOSEPH Person Filing - SAN JACINTO COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2005
  • ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - MARGOLIN, RICHARD F. Person Filing - HORIZON CAPITAL BANK (LIENHOLDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - JOYNER, DEXTER Person Filing - GALENA PARK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT OF HARRIS COUNTY TEXAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2005
  • ORIGINAL PETITION : Filing Attorney - JOYNER, DEXTER Person Filing - CITY OF GALENA PARK TEXAS

    Read MoreRead Less