This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 11/24/2022 at 08:06:29 (UTC).

CITY OF BAYTOWN vs. WARREN, ZETHA

Case Summary

On 10/31/2022 CITY OF BAYTOWN filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against WARREN, ZETHA. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is RABEEA COLLIER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1521

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

RABEEA COLLIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF BAYTOWN

Defendants and Intervenor Plaintiffs

GOOSE CREEK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT

Defendants and Intervenor Defendants

WARREN, ZETHA

Baytown, TX 77521

GOOSE CREEK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON OF HARRIS COUNTY AUTHORITY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT A

10/31/2022: EXHIBIT A

CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST

10/31/2022: CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

10/31/2022: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

10/31/2022: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

Exhibit A

11/07/2022: Exhibit A

Intervenors' Original Petition

11/07/2022: Intervenors' Original Petition

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

11/09/2022: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: GOOSE CREEK INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: WARREN, ZETHA; Issued: 11/1/2022; Served: 11/4/2022; Returned: 11/4/2022; Tracking: 74072004; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person Filing: CITY OF BAYTOWN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less