This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 11/25/2022 at 07:21:27 (UTC).

CITY OF BAYTOWN vs. STERLCHEE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/01/2022 CITY OF BAYTOWN filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against STERLCHEE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is FREDERICKA PHILLIPS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1684

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

FREDERICKA PHILLIPS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF BAYTOWN

Defendants

STERLCHEE CORPORATION

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

Other

STERLCHEE CORPORATION BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT SUZANEE M PETER

913 S Kaufman Dr Deer

Park, TX 77536

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STRONG, RANDALL B.

 

Court Documents

Exhibit A

11/01/2022: Exhibit A

Civil Process Request

11/01/2022: Civil Process Request

CITATION IN DELIQUENT TAX SUIT

11/01/2022: CITATION IN DELIQUENT TAX SUIT

Plaintiff's Original Petition

11/01/2022: Plaintiff's Original Petition

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

11/09/2022: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

Exhibit A

11/09/2022: Exhibit A

Intervenors' Original Petition

11/09/2022: Intervenors' Original Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: Not Downloaded;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: Not Downloaded;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: STERLCHEE CORPORATION BY SERVING ITS REGISTERED AGENT SUZANEE M PETER; Issued: 11/1/2022; Served: 11/4/2022; Returned: 11/4/2022; Tracking: 74071967; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: STRONG, RANDALL B.; Person Filing: CITY OF BAYTOWN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT (A TEXAS NON-PROFIT CORPORATION) (IN REM ONLY) is a litigant

Latest cases where GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED ISD is a litigant