This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/20/2022 at 07:55:03 (UTC).

CITY OF BAYTOWN vs. SAINZ, OSCAR

Case Summary

On 09/26/2022 CITY OF BAYTOWN filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against SAINZ, OSCAR. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTINE WEEMS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1972

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTINE WEEMS

 

Party Details

Intervenor Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs

CITY OF BAYTOWN

LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT

Intervenor Defendants and Defendants

SAINZ, OSCAR

Houston, TX 77040

BANUELAS, MARIA CONCEPCION LOPEZ

Houston, TX 77040

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

LEE COLLEGE

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON OF HARRIS COUNTY AUTHORITY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STRONG, RANDALL B.

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC

 

Court Documents

INTERVENORS' ORIGINAL PETITION

09/30/2022: INTERVENORS' ORIGINAL PETITION

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

09/26/2022: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

09/26/2022: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

09/26/2022: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

Exhibit A

09/26/2022: Exhibit A

REQUEST

09/26/2022: REQUEST

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: CITY OF BAYTOWN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: SAINZ, OSCAR; Issued: 9/29/2022; Returned: 10/14/2022; Received: 10/17/2022; Tracking: 74058121; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURNED/UNEXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: BANUELAS, MARIA CONCEPCION LOPEZ; Issued: 9/29/2022; Returned: 10/14/2022; Received: 10/17/2022; Tracking: 74058114; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: STRONG, RANDALL B.; Person Filing: CITY OF BAYTOWN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEE COLLEGE is a litigant

Latest cases where PORT OF HOUSTON OF HARRIS COUNTY AUTHORITY is a litigant

Latest cases where LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT (A TEXAS NON-PROFIT CORPORATION) (IN REM ONLY) is a litigant

Latest cases where GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED ISD is a litigant