This case was last updated from Harris County District Courts on 10/20/2022 at 07:54:19 (UTC).

CITY OF BAYTOWN vs. ROMERO, JESUS

Case Summary

On 09/26/2022 CITY OF BAYTOWN filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against ROMERO, JESUS. This case was filed in Harris County District Courthouse, Harris County District Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DONNA ROTH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1967

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DONNA ROTH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF BAYTOWN

Intervenor Plaintiffs and Defendants

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT

Defendants and Intervenor Defendants

ROMERO, JESUS

Baytown, TX 77520

GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

LEE COLLEGE

HARRIS COUNTY

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

HARRIS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

PORT OF HOUSTON OF HARRIS COUNTY AUTHORITY

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STRONG, RANDALL B.

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC

 

Court Documents

GCCISD Intervention

09/30/2022: GCCISD Intervention

PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

09/26/2022: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION

CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

09/26/2022: CITATION IN DELINQUENT TAX SUIT

Civil Process Request

09/26/2022: Civil Process Request

Exhibit A

09/26/2022: Exhibit A

Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

10/14/2022: Citation in Delinquent Tax Suit

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: INTERVENTION; Filing Attorney: BENOIT, BRANDON ERIC; Person Filing: LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketType of Service: CITATION (TAX SUIT); Status: SERVICE RETURN/EXECUTED; Instrument: ORIGINAL PETITION; Person: ROMERO, JESUS; Issued: 9/29/2022; Served: 10/11/2022; Returned: 10/11/2022; Tracking: 74058128; Deliver To: CONSTABLE PCT 1 TAX SUIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORIGINAL PETITION; Filing Attorney: STRONG, RANDALL B.; Person Filing: CITY OF BAYTOWN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEE COLLEGE is a litigant

Latest cases where PORT OF HOUSTON OF HARRIS COUNTY AUTHORITY is a litigant

Latest cases where LEE COLLEGE DISTRICT (A TEXAS NON-PROFIT CORPORATION) (IN REM ONLY) is a litigant

Latest cases where GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED ISD is a litigant